blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0043825

EP0043825 - METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF DENTAL PROTHESES BY PHOTOPOLYMERIZATION OF A PLASTIC MASS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.02.1985
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.02.1985No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.04.1985 [1985/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ESPE Fabrik Pharmazeutischer Präparate GmbH
D-8031 Seefeld / Obb. / DE
[1982/03]
Inventor(s)01 / JOCHUM, Peter
Pointweg 5
D-8031 Hechendorf / DE
02 / GASSER, Oswald
Hartstrasse 13
D-8031 Seefeld / DE
[1982/03]
Representative(s)Wuesthoff, Franz, et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1982/03]Wuesthoff, Franz, Dr.-Ing., et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date81900218.915.01.1981
[1982/03]
WO1981DE00014
Priority number, dateDE1980300161617.01.1980         Original published format: DE 3001616
[1982/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO8101959
Date:23.07.1981
[1981/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0043825
Date:20.01.1982
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1982/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0043825
Date:21.03.1984
Language:DE
[1984/12]
Search report(s)
ClassificationIPC:A61K6/08
[1982/03]
CPC:
A61K6/887 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL,   SE [1982/03]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZAHNERSATZTEILEN DURCH PHOTOPOLYMERISIEREN EINER VERFORMBAREN MASSE[1982/03]
English:METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF DENTAL PROTHESES BY PHOTOPOLYMERIZATION OF A PLASTIC MASS[1982/03]
French:PROCEDE POUR LA PREPARATION DE PROTHESES DENTAIRES PAR PHOTOPOLYMERISATION D'UNE MASSE PLASTIQUE[1982/03]
Entry into regional phase16.09.1981National basic fee paid 
16.09.1981Designation fee(s) paid 
16.09.1981Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.09.1981Examination requested  [1982/03]
02.07.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.11.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.1983Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
09.09.1983Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.12.1983Fee for grant paid
01.12.1983Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.12.1984No opposition filed within time limit [1985/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
16.01.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational searchDE2419887  [ ] (ICI LTD);
 FR2156760  [ ] (ICI LTD);
 US3756827  [ ] (TEH LIN CHANG C);
 EP0002831  [ ] (ESPE PHARM PRAEP [DE]);
 DE1516456  [ ] (WILLIAMS GOLD REFINING CO)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.