Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0067168

EP0067168 - HORIZONTAL PHASE DETECTOR GAIN CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  30.06.1995
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOTOROLA, INC.
1303 East Algonquin Road
Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US
[1982/51]
Inventor(s)01 / McGINN, Michael
1325 E. Broadmor
Tempe, AZ 85282 / US
[1982/51]
Representative(s)Hudson, Peter David
Motorola
European Intellectual Property
Midpoint
Alencon Link, Basingstoke
Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/32]Hudson, Peter David
Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
Former [1987/07]Hudson, Peter David
Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link
Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 1PL / GB
Former [1982/51]Ibbotson, Harold
Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link
Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 1PL / GB
Application number, filing date81903038.828.10.1981
[1982/51]
WO1981US01448
Priority number, dateUS1980022060429.12.1980         Original published format: US 220604
[1982/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO8202309
Date:08.07.1982
[1982/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0067168
Date:22.12.1982
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1982
[1982/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0067168
Date:10.08.1988
Language:EN
[1988/32]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0067168
Date:16.08.1995
Language:EN
[1995/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.1985
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/05
[1982/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1982/51]
TitleGerman:VERSTÄRKUNGSSTEUERUNG EINES HORIZONTALPHASENDETEKTORS[1982/51]
English:HORIZONTAL PHASE DETECTOR GAIN CONTROL[1982/51]
French:COMMANDE DE GAIN D'UN DETECTEUR DE PHASE HORIZONTALE[1982/51]
Entry into regional phase06.07.1982National basic fee paid 
06.07.1982Search fee paid 
06.07.1982Designation fee(s) paid 
06.07.1982Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.07.1982Examination requested  [1982/51]
29.07.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0})
08.12.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.02.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.04.1988Fee for grant paid
07.04.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.05.1989  21.06.1989  ADMISSIBLE
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte E.V.
Bahnstrasse 62
D-40210 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Gornott, Dietmar
Katscher Habermann
Patentanwälte
Dolivostrasse 15A
64293 Darmstadt / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1989/27]
Opponent(s)01  08.05.1989  21.06.1989  ADMISSIBLE
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte E.V.
Bahnstrasse 62
D-40210 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Gornott, Dietmar, Dipl.-Ing.
Zilleweg 29
D-64291 Darmstadt / DE
23.06.1989Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.10.1989Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.11.1989Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
10.01.1990Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
29.05.1991Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.1991Reply to a communication from the opposition division
29.01.1992Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
28.11.1994Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.02.1995Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
22.05.1995Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition26.03.1992Appeal received No.  T0266/92
18.05.1992Statement of grounds filed
17.10.1994Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
15.06.1993Date of oral proceedings
17.06.1993Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.1985Renewal fee patent year 05
21.10.1986Renewal fee patent year 06
29.10.1987Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2048605
International search[A]US4048655  (HOFMANN JUDSON A);
 [A]US4063288  (ECKENBRECHT ROBERT R, et al);
 [A]US4203076  (YAMASHITA NORIYUKI [JP]);
 [A]US4214260  (VAN STRAATEN JAN [NL]);
 [A]US4222074  (BREITHAUPT DAVID W);
 [AP]US4250525  (BALABAN ALVIN R [US], et al);
 [AP]US4251833  (FERNSLER RONALD E, et al)