Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0067168 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0067168



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 322
21.08.1995 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
06.07.1995 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
06.07.1995 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
22.05.1995 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
22.05.1995 Translation of the claims Opposition 4
22.05.1995 Translation of the claims Opposition 3
15.02.1995 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
15.02.1995 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
15.02.1995 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 1
15.02.1995 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
07.02.1995 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
18.11.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
18.11.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.10.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.10.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
17.06.1993 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
17.06.1993 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
15.06.1993 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
09.06.1993 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
19.04.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
19.04.1993 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.04.1993 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.04.1993 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
08.04.1993 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
08.04.1993 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
08.04.1993 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
06.04.1993 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
25.03.1993 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.03.1993 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
23.03.1993 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
24.02.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
13.01.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
04.01.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
29.10.1992 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.10.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
27.05.1992 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
18.05.1992 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
18.05.1992 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
16.05.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.05.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.05.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.05.1992 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
15.05.1992 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
26.03.1992 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
06.02.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
05.02.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.02.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
03.02.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.01.1992 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 7
29.01.1992 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
29.01.1992 Means of redress Opposition 1
29.01.1992 Text intended for grant Opposition 12
23.10.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.10.1991 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 2
17.10.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.10.1991 Claims Opposition 2
10.10.1991 Description Opposition 3
10.10.1991 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.10.1991 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 7
01.10.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.09.1991 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.08.1991 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
30.07.1991 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
29.05.1991 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
29.05.1991 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
29.05.1991 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
25.04.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.03.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
10.01.1990 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 3
13.11.1989 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
19.10.1989 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
23.07.1989 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
23.07.1989 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
31.05.1989 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
08.05.1989 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
08.05.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
06.04.1989 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
03.04.1989 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.06.1988 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
07.04.1988 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.04.1988 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
07.04.1988 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
03.02.1988 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
28.01.1988 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
13.10.1987 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.10.1987 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
13.07.1987 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
08.07.1987 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
23.12.1986 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
08.12.1986 Claims Search / examination 4
08.12.1986 Description Search / examination 4
08.12.1986 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.07.1986 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
26.06.1985 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.06.1985 European search report Search / examination 6
15.02.1985 EPO/applicant correspondence crossed Search / examination 1
02.01.1985 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
22.10.1983 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
25.10.1982 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.10.1982 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
04.10.1982 Annex Search / examination 1
04.10.1982 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
31.08.1982 Delay of examination for Euro-PCT applications with WTO/TRIPS priority Search / examination 1
31.08.1982 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
31.08.1982 Subsequently filed documents not duly signed Search / examination 2
24.08.1982 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 2
24.08.1982 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
10.08.1982 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
28.07.1982 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 2
14.07.1982 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 4
13.07.1982 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
08.07.1982 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
08.07.1982 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 26
08.07.1982 Priority document Search / examination 23
06.07.1982 Abstract Search / examination 1
06.07.1982 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
06.07.1982 Claims Search / examination 4
06.07.1982 Claims Search / examination 3
06.07.1982 Description Search / examination 12
06.07.1982 Drawings Search / examination 2
06.07.1982 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
06.07.1982 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
30.06.1982 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
14.01.1982 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
27.11.1981 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1