blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0057349

EP0057349 - Peptide antibiotic, component B, process for its preparation and its use in medicines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.05.1985
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip31.10.1991Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAYER AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1982/32]For all designated states
BAYER AG
D-51368 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Metzger, Karl Georg, Dr.
Pahlkestrasse 15
D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE
02 / Pfitzner, Jörg, Dr.
Claudiusweg 3
D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE
03 / Schmidt, Delf, Dr.
Am Eckbusch 55b
D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE
04 / Weyland, Horst, Dr.
Fichtestrasse 12
D-2850 Bremerhaven / DE
05 / Benz, Günter, Dr.
Am Bölkumer Busch 5
D-5620 Velbert 15 / DE
06 / Schröder, Theo, Dr.
Gellertweg 38
D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE
[1982/32]
Application number, filing date82100121.111.01.1982
[1982/32]
Priority number, dateDE1981310213723.01.1981         Original published format: DE 3102137
[1982/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0057349
Date:11.08.1982
Language:DE
[1982/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0057349
Date:01.09.1982
Language:DE
[1982/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0057349
Date:27.06.1984
Language:DE
[1984/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.06.1982
ClassificationIPC:C07C103/52, C07H19/08, C12P21/02, A61K37/02, // (C12P21/02, C12R1:465)
[1982/32]
CPC:
C07K7/06 (EP,US); A61P31/04 (EP); C07K9/003 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (EP,US); A61K38/00 (EP,US); C12R2001/465 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US); Y10S435/897 (EP,US); Y10S930/19 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1982/32]
TitleGerman:Neues Peptid-Antibiotikum Komponente B, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung sowie seine Verwendung in Arzneimitteln[1982/32]
English:Peptide antibiotic, component B, process for its preparation and its use in medicines[1982/32]
French:Peptide-antibiotique, composante B, son procédé de préparation et son emploi dans des médicaments[1982/32]
Examination procedure11.01.1982Examination requested  [1982/32]
29.12.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.04.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.06.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
22.06.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.1983Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
01.12.1983Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.12.1983Fee for grant paid
12.12.1983Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.03.1985No opposition filed within time limit [1985/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.01.1985
SE12.01.1985
BE31.01.1985
[1991/51]
Former [1988/13]AT11.01.1985
SE12.01.1985
Former [1987/19]AT11.01.1985
Documents cited:Search[A]US4158608  (DAHN URSULA, et al);
 [P]EP0041180  (BAYER AG [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.