Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0059895

EP0059895 - Water-dispersible binders for cationic electrodeposition, and a method for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  11.01.1995
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Lacke + Farben AG
Glasuritstrasse 1
48165 Münster-Hiltrup / DE
[N/P]
Former [1986/29]For all designated states
BASF Lacke + Farben AG
Glasuritstrasse 1
D-48165 Münster-Hiltrup / DE
Former [1982/37]For all designated states
BASF Farben + Fasern Aktiengesellschaft
Am Neumarkt 30
D-2000 Hamburg 70 / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Diefenbach, Horst, Dr. Dipl.-Chem.
Lerchenhain 8
D-4405 Nottuln / DE
02 / Dobbelstein, Arnold, Dr. Dipl.-Chem.
Emil-Nolde-Weg 95
D-4400 Münster / DE
03 / Geist, Michael, Dr. Dipl.-Chem.
Rubensstrasse 251
D-4400 Münster / DE
[1982/37]
Representative(s)Münch, Volker , et al
Dres. Fitzner & Münch
Rechts- und Patentanwälte
Hauser Ring 10
40878 Ratingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/01]Münch, Volker, Dr. , et al
BASF Lacke + Farben AG Patente/Lizenzen/Dokumentation Postfach 61 23
D-48136 Münster / DE
Former [1992/41]Münch, Volker, Dr.
BASF Lacke + Farben AG Patente/Lizenzen/Dokumentation, Postfach 61 23
D-48136 Münster / DE
Former [1990/06](deleted)
...
Former [1982/37]Habbel, Hans-Georg, Dipl.-Ing.
Postfach 34 29
D-48019 Münster / DE
Application number, filing date82101469.326.02.1982
[1982/37]
Priority number, dateDE1981310807304.03.1981         Original published format: DE 3108073
[1982/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0059895
Date:15.09.1982
Language:DE
[1982/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0059895
Date:17.04.1985
Language:DE
[1985/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.07.1982
ClassificationInternational:C09D5/44, C25D13/06, C08G59/02, C08G59/14
[1985/16]
Former International [1982/37]C09D5/40, C08G59/02, C08G59/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1982/37]
TitleGerman:Wasserdispergierbare Bindemittel für kationische Elektrotauchlacke und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung[1982/37]
English:Water-dispersible binders for cationic electrodeposition, and a method for their preparation[1982/37]
French:Liants dispersibles dans l'eau pour électrodéposition cationique et procédé pour leur préparation[1982/37]
Examination procedure15.12.1982Examination requested  [1983/09]
20.06.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
27.01.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
08.08.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.1984Fee for grant paid
14.09.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.01.1986  21.02.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Herberts GmbH & Co. KG
Christbusch 25
D-42285 Wuppertal / DE
Opponent's representative
Türk, Dietmar
Türk, Gille + Hrabal Patentanwälte Bruckner Strasse 20
D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1986/11]
Opponent(s)01  16.01.1986  21.02.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Herberts GmbH
Christbusch 25
D-42285 Wuppertal / DE
Opponent's representative
Türk, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat.
Türk, Gille + Hrabal Patentanwälte Bruckner Strasse 20
D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE
24.02.1986Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.06.1986Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.06.1986Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
01.11.1986Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
24.03.1987Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
08.07.1987Reply to a communication from the opposition division
09.05.1988Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
19.07.1988Reply to a communication from the opposition division
15.09.1992Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1995/09]
28.10.1992Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition08.08.1990Appeal received No.  T0663/90
18.10.1990Statement of grounds filed
13.08.1991Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
15.09.1992Date of oral proceedings
28.10.1992Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2268059  (M & T CHEMICALS INC [US]);
 [X]EP0000086  ;
 [XD]FR2338297  (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]);
 [Y]FR2376197  (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]);
 [A]FR2194797  (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US])