Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0059895 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0059895



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 787
11.01.1995 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
06.11.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.10.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.10.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.10.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.10.1992 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
28.10.1992 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
28.10.1992 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
28.10.1992 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
28.10.1992 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 10
28.10.1992 Means of redress Opposition 1
28.10.1992 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
10.08.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
10.08.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
06.08.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
06.08.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.08.1992 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
04.08.1992 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
17.07.1992 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
16.07.1992 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.07.1992 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.07.1992 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.07.1992 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.05.1992 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.05.1992 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.05.1992 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.05.1992 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.05.1992 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.05.1992 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.05.1992 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.05.1992 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.1992 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.03.1992 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.1992 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.1992 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.12.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.12.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.12.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.12.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.12.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
17.12.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
23.11.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
22.11.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
12.11.1991 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.11.1991 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.10.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
18.10.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.10.1991 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
18.10.1991 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
01.10.1991 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.09.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
25.09.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
13.08.1991 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 8
18.02.1991 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
12.02.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
25.10.1990 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
18.10.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
18.10.1990 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
18.09.1990 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
05.09.1990 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.09.1990 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
08.08.1990 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
15.06.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.06.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.06.1990 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
08.06.1990 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
08.06.1990 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 9
08.06.1990 Means of redress Opposition 1
14.05.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.05.1990 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.05.1990 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.05.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.05.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.05.1990 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.05.1990 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.1990 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
12.01.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.01.1990 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
28.12.1989 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
21.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
21.12.1989 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
20.12.1989 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.12.1989 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
12.12.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.12.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.12.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.12.1989 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
07.12.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
07.12.1989 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.1989 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
07.12.1989 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
13.11.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
13.11.1989 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.11.1989 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.1989 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.10.1989 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.09.1989 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.1989 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
26.07.1989 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
24.07.1989 Refund of fees Appeal 1
03.07.1989 Communication (no form) Appeal 9
03.07.1989 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 1
03.07.1989 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 10
03.07.1989 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 1
21.06.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.06.1989 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
10.03.1989 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
10.03.1989 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.02.1989 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.02.1989 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
17.01.1989 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
29.12.1988 Processing of an appeal Opposition 1
22.12.1988 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
21.10.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.10.1988 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.10.1988 Decision concerning the inadmissibility of the opposition to opponent Opposition 1
19.10.1988 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 5
30.08.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.08.1988 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.08.1988 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.07.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 5
19.07.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 5
09.05.1988 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
09.05.1988 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 2
09.05.1988 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.05.1988 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.04.1988 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
20.04.1988 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 1
14.04.1988 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
13.04.1988 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.04.1988 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
01.04.1988 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 3
01.04.1988 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
19.12.1987 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
18.12.1987 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
18.12.1987 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.12.1987 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.12.1987 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
16.12.1987 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
02.12.1987 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.12.1987 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
27.11.1987 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
27.11.1987 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
26.11.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
26.11.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
15.10.1987 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.10.1987 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.08.1987 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.08.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.08.1987 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
08.07.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.07.1987 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 6
08.07.1987 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 9
27.05.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.05.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.05.1987 Communication concerning signing of documents Opposition 1
19.05.1987 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.1987 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 5
05.03.1987 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
18.02.1987 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.01.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
20.12.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
20.12.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.11.1986 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.11.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
01.11.1986 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 6
18.08.1986 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
08.08.1986 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
26.06.1986 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
14.06.1986 Request for assignment Search / examination 3
06.06.1986 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
28.05.1986 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
23.05.1986 Request for assignment Search / examination 3
24.02.1986 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
24.02.1986 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
24.01.1986 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.01.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.01.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
16.01.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.01.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
16.01.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
16.01.1986 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
16.01.1986 Notice of opposition Opposition 2
30.04.1985 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
22.02.1985 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.09.1984 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.09.1984 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
14.09.1984 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
08.08.1984 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
02.08.1984 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
12.06.1984 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.06.1984 Text intended for grant Search / examination 50
21.02.1984 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
27.01.1984 Description Search / examination 6
27.01.1984 Description Search / examination 9
27.01.1984 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 92
27.01.1984 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.01.1984 Application deemed to be withdrawn (request for further processing without effect) Search / examination 1
13.01.1984 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.11.1983 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.10.1983 Claims Search / examination 7
20.10.1983 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
20.06.1983 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
05.12.1982 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.12.1982 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
09.11.1982 Annex Search / examination 1
09.11.1982 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
23.09.1982 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
17.09.1982 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
25.08.1982 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
13.08.1982 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
22.07.1982 Notification of forthcoming publication Opposition 1
16.07.1982 Document concerning representation Search / examination 5
09.07.1982 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.07.1982 European search report Search / examination 1
27.04.1982 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
27.04.1982 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
27.04.1982 Priority document Search / examination 54
16.04.1982 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
26.02.1982 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.02.1982 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
26.02.1982 Claims Search / examination 9
26.02.1982 Description Search / examination 43
26.02.1982 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.02.1982 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.02.1982 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10