blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0065233

EP0065233 - Carrying gripper for looms [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.11.1989
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VAMATEX S.p.A.
Via Glera 18
I-24020 Villa di Serio (Bergamo) / IT
[1982/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Pezzoli, Nello
Via Monte Grappa 64
I-24026 Leffe (Bergamo) / IT
[1982/47]
Representative(s)Vatti, Paolo, et al
Fumero-Studio Consulenza Brevetti Snc Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1982/47]Vatti, Paolo, Dr. Ing., et al
Fumero-Studio Consulenza Brevetti Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
D-80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date82103945.006.05.1982
[1982/47]
Priority number, dateIT1981002173615.05.1981         Original published format: IT 2173681
[1982/47]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0065233
Date:24.11.1982
Language:EN
[1982/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0065233
Date:25.01.1989
Language:EN
[1989/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.1982
ClassificationIPC:D03D47/00
[1982/47]
CPC:
D03D47/233 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1982/47]
TitleGerman:Transportgreifer für Webmaschinen[1982/47]
English:Carrying gripper for looms[1982/47]
French:Pince d'insertion pour métiers à tisser[1982/47]
Examination procedure14.04.1983Examination requested  [1983/27]
26.04.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
19.06.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.1986Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
06.05.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.07.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.1988Fee for grant paid
01.10.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination03.05.1986Appeal received No.  T0223/86
09.07.1986Statement of grounds filed
22.09.1987Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M03) [1987/39]
01.12.1987Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1987/49]
12.02.1988Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1988/07]
05.04.1988Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1988/15]
12.04.1988Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
Opposition(s)26.10.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1990/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
13.05.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
11.04.1986Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.1987Renewal fee patent year 06
26.04.1988Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3915201  (MACKIE WILLIAM DENIS GRENVILLE);
 [A]DE2757754  (SOMET SOC MEC TESSILE);
 [A]GB2018307  (SOMET SOC MEC TESSILE)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.