Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0065233 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0065233



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 177
24.11.1989 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
21.11.1989 Closing of application Search / examination 1
15.12.1988 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
07.10.1988 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.10.1988 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
07.10.1988 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
27.07.1988 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 13
06.05.1988 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.04.1988 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
12.02.1988 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 8
12.02.1988 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
03.12.1987 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
01.12.1987 Claims Appeal 2
01.12.1987 Description Appeal 5
01.12.1987 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
23.11.1987 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
22.09.1987 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.09.1987 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
07.08.1986 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
07.08.1986 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
09.07.1986 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
22.05.1986 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
03.05.1986 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
03.05.1986 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
03.05.1986 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
11.03.1986 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
07.03.1986 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 9
31.01.1986 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
26.06.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 3
31.05.1985 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 4
24.05.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
23.05.1985 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.03.1985 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
25.03.1985 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.11.1984 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
07.09.1984 Claims Search / examination 1
07.09.1984 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
01.09.1984 Claims Search / examination 1
01.09.1984 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.07.1984 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
04.07.1984 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
12.06.1984 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 10
12.06.1984 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
26.04.1984 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
10.05.1983 Annex Search / examination 1
10.05.1983 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.05.1983 Written request for examination Search / examination 2
29.11.1982 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
28.09.1982 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
06.08.1982 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
06.08.1982 Priority document Search / examination 10
06.08.1982 Translation of priority document Search / examination 7
30.07.1982 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.07.1982 European search report Search / examination 2
24.05.1982 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.05.1982 Claims Search / examination 1
24.05.1982 Description Search / examination 4
24.05.1982 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
06.05.1982 Authorisation Search / examination 1
06.05.1982 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.05.1982 Drawings Search / examination 1
06.05.1982 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
06.05.1982 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10
06.05.1982 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 7
06.05.1982 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1