blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0064734

EP0064734 - Device for applying and tensioning a strap about a package [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.09.1985
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip16.09.1985No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.11.1985 [1985/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cyklop International Emil Hoffmann KG
Cyklopstrasse
D-5000 Köln 50 / DE
[1982/46]
Inventor(s)01 / * * *
02 / * * *
03 / * * *
[1982/46]
Representative(s)Buschhoff, Josef, et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Buschhoff Dipl.-Ing. Hennicke, Dipl.-Ing. Vollbach Kaiser-Wilhelm-Ring 24 Postfach 190 408
50501 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [1982/46]Buschhoff, Josef, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Buschhoff Dipl.-Ing. Hennicke, Dipl.-Ing. Vollbach Kaiser-Wilhelm-Ring 24 Postfach 190 408
D-50501 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date82103968.207.05.1982
[1982/46]
Priority number, dateDE1981311871212.05.1981         Original published format: DE 3118712
[1982/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0064734
Date:17.11.1982
Language:DE
[1982/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0064734
Date:14.11.1984
Language:DE
[1984/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.09.1982
ClassificationIPC:B65B13/22
[1982/46]
CPC:
B65B13/22 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1982/46]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Anlegen und Spannen eines Umreifungsbandes um ein Packstück[1982/46]
English:Device for applying and tensioning a strap about a package[1982/46]
French:Dispositif pour appliquer et tendre une bande de serrage autour d'un emballage[1982/46]
Examination procedure13.10.1982Examination requested  [1982/51]
12.03.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
02.05.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.07.1984Fee for grant paid
10.07.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.08.1985No opposition filed within time limit [1985/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE1945837  (SIGNODE CORP);
 [A]US3526187  (GILLIARD ALLEN F);
 [A]DE2224673
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.