Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0065705 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0065705



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 380
18.11.1991 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
11.11.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.11.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.11.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.09.1991 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
30.09.1991 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
30.09.1991 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
24.09.1991 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
24.09.1991 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 13
24.09.1991 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
10.09.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.09.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.09.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
19.06.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
16.05.1991 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.05.1991 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.05.1991 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.05.1991 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
10.05.1991 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
10.05.1991 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
23.07.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.07.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.07.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
27.06.1990 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
27.06.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.06.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
21.05.1990 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
21.05.1990 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
18.05.1990 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
18.05.1990 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
11.05.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.05.1990 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
04.05.1990 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
04.01.1990 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
04.01.1990 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
04.01.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.12.1989 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
20.12.1989 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
20.12.1989 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
20.12.1989 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
19.12.1989 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
29.11.1989 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
09.11.1989 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.10.1989 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
06.10.1989 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
06.10.1989 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
17.08.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.08.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.08.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.08.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
11.08.1989 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
11.08.1989 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 11
11.08.1989 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
11.08.1989 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.1989 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.1989 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.1989 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
25.01.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
20.01.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.01.1989 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.01.1989 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.01.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.01.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.01.1989 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
17.01.1989 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.01.1989 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
17.01.1989 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
17.01.1989 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
11.01.1989 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.12.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
15.12.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.12.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.12.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.12.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.12.1988 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.12.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
09.12.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
09.12.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
04.11.1988 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
04.11.1988 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.11.1988 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
04.11.1988 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
04.11.1988 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
03.11.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.11.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.10.1988 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
31.08.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
19.08.1988 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
20.06.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.06.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.06.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
27.05.1988 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
28.04.1988 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
28.04.1988 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
14.10.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.10.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.09.1987 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 2
11.09.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.08.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.08.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.08.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.08.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.08.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.08.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
31.07.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.07.1987 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 1
21.07.1987 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
21.07.1987 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
21.07.1987 Request for documents Opposition 1
19.06.1987 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 11
19.06.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
19.06.1987 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
02.04.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
19.03.1987 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
17.11.1986 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
17.11.1986 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.11.1986 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
23.10.1986 Request for change of address of the applicant Search / examination 1
05.09.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.09.1986 N/A Opposition 1
02.09.1986 N/A Opposition 1
01.09.1986 Authorisation Opposition 1
01.09.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.08.1986 Authorisation Opposition 1
26.08.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.08.1986 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
20.08.1986 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
01.08.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
01.08.1986 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
18.06.1986 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
13.06.1986 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
12.06.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
12.06.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
12.06.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
12.06.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
12.06.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
05.06.1986 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
14.01.1986 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
07.11.1985 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.07.1985 English translation of the claims Search / examination 1
16.07.1985 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.07.1985 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
19.06.1985 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
11.06.1985 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
16.04.1985 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.04.1985 Text intended for grant Search / examination 6
13.03.1985 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
30.01.1985 Claims Search / examination 1
30.01.1985 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.11.1984 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
03.09.1984 Description Search / examination 2
03.09.1984 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
04.05.1984 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
10.12.1982 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
05.10.1982 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
24.09.1982 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.09.1982 European search report Search / examination 1
30.06.1982 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
30.06.1982 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
25.06.1982 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
25.06.1982 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
25.06.1982 Subsequently filed documents not duly signed Search / examination 1
19.05.1982 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
19.05.1982 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
19.05.1982 Priority document Search / examination 9
12.05.1982 Abstract Search / examination 1
12.05.1982 Claims Search / examination 1
12.05.1982 Description Search / examination 5
12.05.1982 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
12.05.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
12.05.1982 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10