Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0070468

EP0070468 - Metal Oxide varistor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  08.11.1990
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1984/42]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP
Former [1984/36]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP
Former [1983/04]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Imai, Motomasa
313, Inagi-haikopo 139-4, Omaru
Inagi-shi Tokyo / JP
02 / Takahashi, Takashi
3-48-1-617, Takinogawa
Kita-ku Tokyo / JP
03 / Furukawa, Osamu
4-231, Kenei-Kamimizo Daiichi-Danchi, 3-4-23-1
Hikarigaoka Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP
04 / Kanai, Hideyuki
1020, Shimo-Sakunobe Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP
[1983/04]
Representative(s)Lehn, Werner , et al
Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20
81904 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1983/04]Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20
D-81904 München / DE
Application number, filing date82106123.108.07.1982
[1983/04]
Priority number, dateJP1981011002816.07.1981         Original published format: JP 11002881
[1983/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0070468
Date:26.01.1983
Language:EN
[1983/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0070468
Date:24.08.1983
Language:EN
[1983/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0070468
Date:06.05.1987
Language:EN
[1987/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.06.1983
ClassificationInternational:H01C7/10
[1983/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [1983/04]
TitleGerman:Metalloxydvaristor[1983/04]
English:Metal Oxide varistor[1983/04]
French:Varistance en oxyde métallique[1983/04]
Examination procedure16.12.1983Examination requested  [1984/08]
03.12.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.06.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.01.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
07.11.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.01.1987Fee for grant paid
13.01.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.02.1988  25.02.1988  ADMISSIBLE
Asea Brown Boveri AG
Haselstr.16 Postfach
CH-5401 Baden / CH
 [N/P]
Former [1988/13]
Opponent(s)01  01.02.1988  25.02.1988  ADMISSIBLE
Asea Brown Boveri AG
Haslerstr.16 Postfach
CH-5401 Baden / CH
10.03.1988Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.09.1988Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.09.1988Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
10.11.1988Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
04.08.1989Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
19.09.1990Legal effect of revocation of patent [1990/52]
Appeal following opposition23.08.1989Appeal received No.  T0549/89
04.12.1989Statement of grounds filed
19.09.1990Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
19.09.1990Date of oral proceedings
21.09.1990Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.1986Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US4045374  ;
 [Y]DE2642567  ;
 [Y]US3670216  ;
 [A]US3611073  ;
 [A]US2791521