Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0070468 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0070468



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 342
09.11.1990 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
09.11.1990 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
09.11.1990 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
21.09.1990 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
21.09.1990 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
19.09.1990 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 11
19.09.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
25.07.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
25.07.1990 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.07.1990 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.07.1990 Communication (no form) Appeal 7
19.07.1990 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
19.07.1990 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
16.07.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Appeal 1
04.07.1990 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
23.04.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.04.1990 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 2
13.12.1989 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
04.12.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
04.12.1989 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
15.09.1989 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
15.09.1989 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
15.09.1989 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
23.08.1989 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
23.08.1989 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
23.08.1989 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
23.08.1989 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
23.08.1989 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
23.08.1989 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
23.08.1989 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
23.08.1989 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
10.08.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.08.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.08.1989 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
04.08.1989 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
04.08.1989 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 6
17.05.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.04.1989 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
28.04.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.04.1989 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
24.11.1988 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Search / examination 22
24.11.1988 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Search / examination 6
17.11.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.11.1988 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 3
12.09.1988 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
06.09.1988 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 2
18.07.1988 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
08.07.1988 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
10.03.1988 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
10.03.1988 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
09.02.1988 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
01.02.1988 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
11.05.1987 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
01.04.1987 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
13.01.1987 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.01.1987 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
13.01.1987 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
07.11.1986 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
30.07.1986 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
30.07.1986 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
30.06.1986 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 3
07.01.1986 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
18.11.1985 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
08.11.1985 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.07.1985 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
03.06.1985 Annex Search / examination 2
03.06.1985 Claims Search / examination 1
03.06.1985 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
25.04.1985 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
03.04.1985 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.12.1984 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
04.07.1984 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
25.05.1984 Annex Search / examination 3
25.05.1984 General authorisation Search / examination 1
25.05.1984 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 3
16.12.1983 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
26.08.1983 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
20.06.1983 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.06.1983 European search report Search / examination 2
05.04.1983 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
05.04.1983 Translation of priority document Search / examination 19
30.11.1982 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
06.09.1982 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
06.09.1982 Priority document Search / examination 22
08.07.1982 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
08.07.1982 Claims Search / examination 3
08.07.1982 Description Search / examination 14
08.07.1982 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.07.1982 Drawings Search / examination 2
08.07.1982 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
08.07.1982 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
08.07.1982 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
08.07.1982 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10