Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0072917 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0072917



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 465
07.05.1990 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
08.02.1990 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
08.02.1990 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
08.02.1990 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
08.11.1989 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
08.11.1989 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
08.11.1989 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
07.11.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.11.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.11.1989 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 16
07.11.1989 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 15
07.11.1989 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
07.11.1989 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
07.11.1989 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
07.11.1989 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.11.1989 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.08.1989 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
14.08.1989 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.08.1989 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.08.1989 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.08.1989 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
08.08.1989 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
08.08.1989 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
08.08.1989 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
07.08.1989 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
25.06.1989 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
16.06.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.06.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.06.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.06.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.06.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.05.1989 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
20.05.1989 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
20.05.1989 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
19.04.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.04.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.03.1989 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
21.03.1989 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
09.03.1989 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.02.1989 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
27.02.1989 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
09.02.1989 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
06.12.1988 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.12.1988 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
30.11.1988 Claims Appeal 1
30.11.1988 Description Appeal 6
30.11.1988 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 2
29.11.1988 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
26.10.1988 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
14.10.1988 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
16.09.1988 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
16.09.1988 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
26.08.1988 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
01.08.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.07.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.07.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.07.1988 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
27.07.1988 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
27.07.1988 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
27.07.1988 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 7
21.04.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
18.04.1988 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 5
24.03.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
18.03.1988 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 2
11.02.1988 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.02.1988 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
11.02.1988 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
20.01.1988 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
09.11.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
27.10.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
29.09.1987 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
29.09.1987 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
29.09.1987 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
28.07.1987 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
23.07.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
23.07.1987 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
23.07.1987 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
23.07.1987 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
23.07.1987 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.07.1987 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
23.07.1987 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
21.07.1987 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
20.07.1987 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
20.07.1987 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
13.07.1987 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
13.07.1987 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
13.07.1987 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
13.07.1987 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
13.07.1987 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
13.07.1987 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.07.1987 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
13.07.1987 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
13.07.1987 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.12.1986 Description Search / examination 5
16.12.1986 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
11.09.1986 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
11.06.1986 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
11.06.1986 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
11.06.1986 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
12.03.1986 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
01.03.1986 Description Search / examination 2
11.02.1986 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
30.01.1986 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
23.08.1985 Claims Search / examination 1
22.08.1985 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
25.04.1985 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.03.1985 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
05.01.1983 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
11.12.1982 Written request for examination Search / examination 2
09.12.1982 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.12.1982 European search report Search / examination 1
09.12.1982 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
25.09.1982 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
25.08.1982 Priority document Search / examination 11
25.08.1982 Priority document Search / examination 14
16.07.1982 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.07.1982 Claims Search / examination 2
16.07.1982 Description Search / examination 13
16.07.1982 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
16.07.1982 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.07.1982 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
16.07.1982 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
16.07.1982 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 24
16.07.1982 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
16.07.1982 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10