Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0078366

EP0078366 - Condenser feed-through for high-voltage electrical apparatuses [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  30.06.1988
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VEB Transformatorenwerk "Karl Liebknecht"
Wilhelminenhofstrasse 83-85
DDR-1160 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [1983/19]For all designated states
VEB Transformatorenwerk "Karl Liebknecht"
Wilhelminenhofstrasse 83-85
DDR-1160 Berlin / DD
Inventor(s)01 / Pfeiffer, Günter, Dr.
Bonnackenstrasse 4
DDR-7500 Cottbus / DD
02 / Reich, Werner, Dr.
Strasse des Komsomol 88
DDR-7513 Cottbus / DD
03 / Liebscher, Klaus
Michael-Bey-Strasse 4
DDR-7500 Cottbus / DD
04 / Grose, Albert
Hans-Beimler-Strasse 43
DDR-7500 Cottbus / DD
05 / Zürich, Wolfgang
Wilhelm-Blos-Strasse 87
DDR-1150 Berlin / DD
06 / Brödner, Gerhard
Herrenhausstrasse 13
DDR-1197 Berlin / DD
07 / Voss, Joachim
Wohlgemuthstrasse 3
DDR-1195 Berlin / DD
[1983/19]
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Beetz & Partner
Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Former [1983/19]Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date82106906.930.07.1982
[1983/19]
Priority number, dateDD1980000234503.11.1981         Original published format: DD 234580
[1983/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0078366
Date:11.05.1983
Language:DE
[1983/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0078366
Date:22.10.1986
Language:DE
[1986/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.09.1986
ClassificationInternational:H01B17/28, H01B17/54
[1986/35]
Former International [1983/19]H01B17/28
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1983/19]
TitleGerman:Kondensator-Durchführung für elektrische Hochspannungsgeräte[1983/19]
English:Condenser feed-through for high-voltage electrical apparatuses[1983/19]
French:Traversée à condensateur pour appareils électriques à haute tension[1983/19]
File destroyed:01.08.1994
Examination procedure29.01.1987Examination requested  [1987/15]
06.07.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.11.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.1988Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1988/33]
11.02.1988Application refused, date of legal effect [1988/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.1986Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.1987Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP56150808  ;
 [X]US1983371  (HILLEBRAND WILLIAM A);
 [Y]US4308420  (SCOTT PAUL D);
 [Y]US4123618  (CUSHING GEORGE B, et al);
 [A]FR1387067  (COMP GENERALE ELECTRICITE);
 [A]US1856125  (AUSTIN ARTHUR O)
 [Y]  PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 6, Nr. 32 (E-96)[910], 26. Februar 1982; & JP-A-56 150 808 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 21.11.1981,