blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0074518

EP0074518 - Precision grinding machine, in particular projection form grinding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  18.02.1989
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.1989Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 05.04.1989 [1989/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Werkzeugmaschinenbau Präzisions-Technik GmbH
Carl-Jacob-Kolb-Weg
97877 Wertheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/11]For all designated states
Werkzeugmaschinenbau Präzisions-Technik GmbH
Carl-Jacob-Kolb-Weg
D-97877 Wertheim / DE
Former [1988/01]For all designated states
Werkzeugmaschinenbau Präzisions-Technik GmbH Wertheim
Carl-Jacob-Kolb-Weg
D-97877 Wertheim / DE
Former [1983/12]For all designated states
Kolb, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing
Haus am Tannenberg
D-6980 Wertheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1983/12]
Representative(s)Katscher, Helmut
Katscher Habermann Patentanwälte Dolivostrasse 15A
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/22]Katscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing.
Fröbelweg 1
D-64291 Darmstadt / DE
Former [1983/37]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner
Uhlandstrasse 14 c
D-70182 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1983/12]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner
Uhlandstrasse 14c
D-7000 Stuttgart-1 / DE
Application number, filing date82107665.021.08.1982
[1983/12]
Priority number, dateDE1981313624012.09.1981         Original published format: DE 3136240
[1983/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0074518
Date:23.03.1983
Language:DE
[1983/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0074518
Date:20.07.1983
Language:DE
[1983/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0074518
Date:29.01.1986
Language:DE
[1986/05]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0074518
Date:05.04.1989
Language:DE
[1989/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.05.1983
ClassificationIPC:B24B17/04, B24B49/18
[1983/12]
CPC:
B24B49/18 (EP); B24B17/04 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1983/12]
TitleGerman:Präzisionsschleifmaschine, insbesondere Projektions- Formenschleifmaschine[1983/12]
English:Precision grinding machine, in particular projection form grinding machine[1983/12]
French:Rectifieuse de précision, en particulier rectifieuse de formes par projection[1983/12]
Examination procedure19.01.1984Examination requested  [1984/13]
18.12.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
16.07.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.1985Fee for grant paid
12.10.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.10.1986  26.11.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Körber AG
Patentabteilung
D-21027 Hamburg / DE
 [1988/02]
Former [1986/52]
Opponent(s)01  24.10.1986    ADMISSIBLE
Körber AG
Patentabteilung
D-21027 Hamburg / DE
19.12.1986Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.06.1987Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.08.1987Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
21.10.1987Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
04.11.1988Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
13.01.1989Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.08.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
16.08.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YD]DE2452396  (HECKLER & KOCH GMBH);
 [Y]GB1213631  (WICKMAN MACH TOOL SALES LTD);
 [AD]DE473868  (VER STAHLWERKE AG, et al)
 [Y]  - OBERFL[CHENTECHNIK, 53. Jahrg., Oktober-Dezember 1976, Coburg "Die neue numerisch gesteuerte Formschleifmaschine für Messerköpfe und Fräser", Seite 384
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.