blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0074029

EP0074029 - Apparatus for keeping an animal body suspending from a travelling conveyor in a desired position [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1983/11]Apparatus for keeping an animal carcass suspending from a travelling conveyor in a desired position
[1987/19]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.03.1988
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 31.10.2007  [2007/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BANSS MASCHINENFABRIK GmbH & CO. KG
Industriestrasse 4
D-35216 Biedenkopf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/16]For all designated states
Banss Maschinenfabrik GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 4
D-35216 Biedenkopf / DE
Former [1983/11]For all designated states
BANSS MASCHINENFABRIK GmbH & CO. KG
Industriestrasse 1
D-35216 Biedenkopf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Gerlach, Curt, Ing.
Urbanstrasse 7
D-3560 Biedenkopf / DE
02 / Kaufmann, Siegfried, Ing.
Hauptstrasse 19
D-3563 Dautphetal 1 / DE
[1983/11]
Representative(s)Klunker, Hans-Friedrich, et al
Klunker IP Patenanwälte PartGmbB
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/47]Klunker, Hans-Friedrich, Dr., et al
Patentanwälte Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106
D-80797 München / DE
Former [1983/25]Kador & Partner
Corneliusstrasse 15
D-80469 München / DE
Former [1983/11]Dr. Elisabeth Jung Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn Dipl.-Ing. Claus Gernhardt
Postfach 40 14 68
D-80714 München / DE
Application number, filing date82107870.626.08.1982
[1983/11]
Priority number, dateDE1981313398828.08.1981         Original published format: DE 3133988
[1983/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0074029
Date:16.03.1983
Language:DE
[1983/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0074029
Date:28.03.1984
Language:DE
[1984/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0074029
Date:06.05.1987
Language:DE
[1987/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.1984
ClassificationIPC:A22B7/00
[1983/11]
CPC:
A22B7/001 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1983/11]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Halten eines hängend geförderten Tierkörpers in gewünschter Stellung[1983/11]
English:Apparatus for keeping an animal body suspending from a travelling conveyor in a desired position[1987/19]
French:Dispositif pour maintenir dans une position voulue une carcasse d'animal suspendue à un convoyeur en marche[1983/11]
Former [1983/11]Apparatus for keeping an animal carcass suspending from a travelling conveyor in a desired position
File destroyed:15.01.2000
Examination procedure27.09.1984Examination requested  [1984/49]
11.11.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.05.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
10.11.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.1987Fee for grant paid
09.01.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.02.1988No opposition filed within time limit [1988/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.1986Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.09.198605   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.1986
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT06.05.1987
SE31.05.1987
[1999/42]
Former [1989/18]SE31.05.1987
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE931571  (BECK & HENKEL MASCHB AG);
 [Y]GB1121754  (NIELS AXEL OERUM MEIER);
 [Y]NL7109679
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.