blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0074669

EP0074669 - Apparatus for supplying, in particular caking, fuels to a fluidized-bed reactor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1983/12]Apparatus for supplying, in particular caking, fuels to a fluidized-bed reactor and process for its operation
[1986/45]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.09.1987
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.1987No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.10.1987 [1987/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bergwerksverband GmbH
Franz-Fischer-Weg 61
D-45307 Essen / DE
[1983/12]
Inventor(s)01 / Peters, Werner, Dr. Prof.
Langacker 5
D-4630 Bochum 6 / DE
02 / Kirchhoff, Reinhold, Dr.
Hombergsring 56
D-4320 Hattingen / DE
03 / Jüntgen, Harald, Dr. Prof.
Bonscheidterstrasse 79
D-4300 Essen 15 / DE
04 / Wagener, Heinrich
Mettestrasse 9
D-4630 Bochum / DE
05 / van Heek, Karl Heinrich, Dr.
Fährenkotten 3
D-4300 Essen 15 / DE
[1983/12]
Application number, filing date82108481.115.09.1982
[1983/12]
Priority number, dateDE1981313664516.09.1981         Original published format: DE 3136645
[1983/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0074669
Date:23.03.1983
Language:DE
[1983/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0074669
Date:28.09.1983
Language:DE
[1983/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0074669
Date:05.11.1986
Language:DE
[1986/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.07.1983
ClassificationIPC:C10J3/50, C10J3/56, F23K3/02, B01J8/00
[1983/12]
CPC:
B01J8/0015 (EP); C10J3/482 (EP); C10J3/503 (EP);
F23K3/02 (EP); C10J2200/152 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1983/12]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Dosierung von, insbesondere backenden, Brennstoffen in einen Wirbelschichtreaktor[1986/45]
English:Apparatus for supplying, in particular caking, fuels to a fluidized-bed reactor[1986/45]
French:Installation pour le dosage de combustibles, en particulier collants, dans un réacteur à lit fluide[1986/45]
Former [1983/12]Verfahren zur Dosierung von, insbesondere backenden, Brennstoffen in einen Wirbelschichtreaktor sowie Verfahren zum Betreiben einer solchen Vorrichtung
Former [1983/12]Apparatus for supplying, in particular caking, fuels to a fluidized-bed reactor and process for its operation
Former [1983/12]Installation pour le dosage de combustibles, en particulier collants, dans un réacteur à lit fluide ainsi que procédé de son fonctionnement
Examination procedure23.09.1983Examination requested  [1983/48]
04.06.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.12.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
20.08.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
10.03.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.1986Fee for grant paid
10.04.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP84115328.1  / EP0150390
Opposition(s)06.08.1987No opposition filed within time limit [1987/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.1986Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2714355  (KLEIN ALB KG);
 [A]FR2333852  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]);
 [A]DE2549784  (BERGWERKSVERBAND GMBH);
 [A]FR905202  ;
 [A]US2971830  (TOSHIO KAWAI, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.