Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0076426

EP0076426 - Multiple chamber deposition and isolation system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  14.04.1992
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES, INC.
1675 West Maple Road Troy
Michigan 48084 / US
[N/P]
Former [1983/15]For all designated states
ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES, INC.
1675 West Maple Road
Troy Michigan 48084 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Canella, Vincent D.
19961 Shrewbury
Detroit, MI. 48221 / US
02 / Izu, Masatsugu
15801 Providence Drive No.9B
Southfield, MI.48037 / US
03 / Hudgens, Stephen J.
2 Alexandria Town
Southfield, MI.48075 / US
[1983/15]
Representative(s)Müller, Hans-Jürgen , et al
Müller Schupfner & Partner
Patentanwälte
Bavariaring 11
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1983/15]Müller, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Postfach 10 11 61
D-80085 München / DE
Application number, filing date82108699.821.09.1982
[1983/15]
Priority number, dateUS1981030614628.09.1981         Original published format: US 306146
[1983/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0076426
Date:13.04.1983
Language:EN
[1983/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0076426
Date:25.07.1984
Language:EN
[1984/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0076426
Date:26.11.1986
Language:EN
[1986/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.05.1984
ClassificationInternational:C23C16/54, C23C14/56
[1986/48]
Former International [1983/15]C23C11/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1983/15]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Niederschlag und zur Isolation mit mehreren Kammern[1983/15]
English:Multiple chamber deposition and isolation system and method[1983/15]
French:Dispositif de dépôt et d'isolement à plusieurs chambres[1983/15]
Examination procedure29.11.1984Examination requested  [1985/07]
11.09.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.12.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
28.05.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.08.1986Fee for grant paid
05.08.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.08.1987  04.11.1987  ADMISSIBLE
LEYBOLD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wilhelm-Rohn-Strasse 25 Postfach 15 55
D-63405 Hanau / DE
Opponent's representative
Zapfe, Hans
Patentanwalt
Postfach 20 01 51
63136 Heusenstamm / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1987/40]
Opponent(s)01  07.08.1987  04.11.1987  ADMISSIBLE
LEYBOLD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wilhelm-Rohn-Strasse 25 Postfach 15 55
D-63405 Hanau / DE
Opponent's representative
Zapfe, Hans, Dipl.-Ing.
Postfach 20 01 51
D-63136 Heusenstamm / DE
05.11.1987Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.01.1988Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.02.1988Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
06.05.1988Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
24.03.1992Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
03.04.1992Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1992/23]
Appeal following opposition28.07.1989Appeal received No.  T0490/89
19.09.1989Statement of grounds filed
19.06.1991Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1991/25]
25.07.1991Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1991/30]
14.02.1992Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
20.08.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
21.08.1986Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH26.11.1986
LI26.11.1986
LU30.09.1987
BE30.09.1988
GB21.11.1988
[2000/03]
Former [1999/52]CH26.11.1986
LI26.11.1986
LU30.09.1987
BE30.09.1988
Former [1989/35]CH26.11.1986
LI26.11.1986
BE30.09.1988
Former [1989/23]CH26.11.1986
LI26.11.1986
Documents cited:Search[A]JP56114387  ;
 [A]JP54153740  ;
 [A]JP51131461  ;
 [A]FR1583684  ;
 [A]FR2307202  (SOGEME [FR]);
 [A]EP0018690  (ADVANCED COATING TECH [US])
 [A]  - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 192 (E-85)[864], 8th December 1981 & JP - A - 56 114 387 (SANYO DENKI K.K.) 08-09-1981, & JP56114387 A 00000000
 [A]  - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 16, 7th February 1980, page 146 C 72 & JP - A - 54 153 740 (NIPPON SHINKU GIJUTSU K.K.) 04-12-1979, & JP54153740 A 00000000
 [A]  - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 1, no. 17, 23rd March 1977, page 865 C 76 & JP - A - 51 131 461 (NIPPON SHINKU GIJUTSU K.K.) 15-11-1976, & JP51131461 A 00000000