Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0076426 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0076426



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 475
13.04.1992 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
24.02.1992 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
24.02.1992 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.02.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.02.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
15.02.1992 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.02.1992 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.02.1992 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
11.02.1992 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
07.02.1992 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
07.02.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.02.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.10.1991 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
12.10.1991 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.10.1991 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
07.10.1991 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
07.10.1991 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
16.09.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.09.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 20
06.09.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
06.09.1991 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
30.07.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.07.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
19.06.1991 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
19.06.1991 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
13.11.1989 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
27.09.1989 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.09.1989 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.09.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.09.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.09.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.09.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.09.1989 Claims Appeal 2
19.09.1989 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 1
19.09.1989 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 14
17.08.1989 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
28.07.1989 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
01.07.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.06.1989 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
26.05.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.05.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 14
18.05.1989 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
18.05.1989 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
28.09.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.08.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
24.06.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.05.1988 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 4
04.02.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.02.1988 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
21.01.1988 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
21.01.1988 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
21.01.1988 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
13.01.1988 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
13.01.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.11.1987 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
05.11.1987 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
13.08.1987 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
07.08.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
07.08.1987 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
07.08.1987 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.08.1987 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.08.1987 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.10.1986 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
05.08.1986 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.08.1986 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
05.08.1986 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
28.05.1986 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
05.05.1986 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.03.1986 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.03.1986 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
17.02.1986 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 3
05.02.1986 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
20.12.1985 Claims Search / examination 4
20.12.1985 Description Search / examination 4
20.12.1985 Description Search / examination 3
20.12.1985 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
11.09.1985 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
29.11.1984 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
08.08.1984 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
25.05.1984 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.05.1984 European search report Search / examination 3
05.03.1984 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
16.02.1983 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
27.01.1983 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
16.12.1982 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
28.10.1982 Drawings Search / examination 1
28.10.1982 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
19.10.1982 Drawings Search / examination 1
19.10.1982 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
19.10.1982 Priority document Search / examination 38
18.10.1982 Invitation to remedy deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 2
15.10.1982 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 4
21.09.1982 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.09.1982 Claims Search / examination 5
21.09.1982 Description Search / examination 20
21.09.1982 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.09.1982 Drawings Search / examination 1
21.09.1982 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
21.09.1982 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 46
21.09.1982 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 16
21.09.1982 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 16
21.09.1982 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
21.09.1982 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
21.09.1982 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 46
21.09.1982 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
21.09.1982 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
21.09.1982 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
21.09.1982 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
21.09.1982 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
21.09.1982 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
21.09.1982 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10