Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0090073

EP0090073 - Process for making a flexible, air-permeable, textile, flat sheet-like filter for protective suits [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1983/40]Flat sheet-like filter and process for making it
[1996/45]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  20.09.1996
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 03.09.2008  [2008/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
von Blücher, Hubert
Freytagstrasse 45
D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE
For all designated states
von Blücher, Hasso
Sohnstrasse 58
D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE
For all designated states
de Ruiter, Ernest, Dr.
Höhenstrasse 57a
51381 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1983/40]For all designated states
von Blücher, Hubert
Freytagstrasse 45
D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE
For all designated states
von Blücher, Hasso
Sohnstrasse 58
D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE
For all designated states
de Ruiter, Ernest, Dr.
Höhenstrasse 57a
D-51381 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1983/40]
Representative(s)Eggert, Hans-Gunther
Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Postfach 10 13 54
45013 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1983/40]Eggert, Hans-Gunther, Dr.
Räderscheidtstrasse 1
D-50935 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date82108971.128.09.1982
[1983/40]
Priority number, dateDE1982321132227.03.1982         Original published format: DE 3211322
[1983/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0090073
Date:05.10.1983
Language:DE
[1983/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0090073
Date:07.11.1984
Language:DE
[1984/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0090073
Date:09.04.1986
Language:DE
[1986/15]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0090073
Date:06.11.1996
Language:DE
[1996/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.09.1984
ClassificationInternational:B01D39/00, A62B17/00, A62B23/00, B01J20/32
[1983/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1983/40]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines flexiblen, luftdurchlässigen, textilen Flächenfilters für Schutzanzüge[1996/45]
English:Process for making a flexible, air-permeable, textile, flat sheet-like filter for protective suits[1996/45]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un filtre textile à surface plane et perméable à l'air pour vêtements de protection[1996/45]
Former [1983/40]Flächenfilter und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung
Former [1983/40]Flat sheet-like filter and process for making it
Former [1983/40]Filtre à surface plane et son procédé de fabrication
Examination procedure12.03.1985Examination requested  [1985/22]
20.09.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
30.09.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.12.1985Fee for grant paid
12.12.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.01.1987  06.02.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Helsa-Werke Helmut Sandler GmbH & Co. KG
Bayreuther Strasse 3-11 Postfach 60
D-95479 Gefrees / DE
Opponent's representative
Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz, et al
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1987/14]
Opponent(s)01  03.01.1987  06.02.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Helsa-Werke Helmut Sandler GmbH & Co. KG
Bayreuther Strasse 3-11 Postfach 60
D-95479 Gefrees / DE
Opponent's representative
LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH, et al
Postfach 3055
D-90014 Nürnberg / DE
Former [1987/10]
Opponent(s)01  03.01.1987   
Helsa-Werke Helmut Sandler GmbH & Co. KG
Bayreuther Strasse 3-11 Postfach 60
D-95479 Gefrees / DE
Opponent's representative
Louis, Dieter, et al
LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH Kesslerplatz 1
D-8500 Nürnberg / DE
18.02.1987Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.10.1987Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.11.1987Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
19.07.1991Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
29.01.1992Reply to a communication from the opposition division
28.09.1992Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
31.03.1993Reply to a communication from the opposition division
09.06.1993Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
21.11.1995Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
07.02.1996Reply to a communication from the opposition division
27.02.1996Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.03.1996Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.06.1996Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
18.07.1996Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition05.08.1993Appeal received No.  T0720/93
14.10.1993Statement of grounds filed
19.09.1995Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
12.10.1988Appeal received No.  T0500/88
30.12.1988Statement of grounds filed
12.07.1990Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
19.09.1995Date of oral proceedings
27.09.1995Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.09.1993
GB28.09.1993
LU28.09.1993
SE29.09.1993
BE30.09.1993
CH30.09.1993
FR30.09.1993
LI30.09.1993
NL01.04.1994
[2008/36]
Former [2004/38]AT28.09.1993
GB28.09.1993
LU28.09.1993
SE29.09.1993
BE30.09.1993
CH30.09.1993
LI30.09.1993
NL01.04.1994
Former [1999/52]AT28.09.1993
GB28.09.1993
SE29.09.1993
BE30.09.1993
CH30.09.1993
LI30.09.1993
LU30.09.1993
NL01.04.1994
Former [1995/08]AT28.09.1993
GB28.09.1993
SE29.09.1993
BE30.09.1993
CH30.09.1993
LI30.09.1993
NL01.04.1994
Former [1994/49]AT28.09.1993
GB28.09.1993
SE29.09.1993
BE30.09.1993
CH30.09.1993
LI30.09.1993
Former [1994/48]AT28.09.1993
SE29.09.1993
BE30.09.1993
CH30.09.1993
LI30.09.1993
Former [1994/46]AT28.09.1993
SE29.09.1993
CH30.09.1993
LI30.09.1993
Former [1994/31]SE29.09.1993
CH30.09.1993
LI30.09.1993
Former [1994/28]SE29.09.1993
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2353327  (HOLLINGSWORTH & VOSE CO [US])