Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0090073 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0090073



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 578
14.06.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
13.02.1997 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
26.09.1996 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 2
26.09.1996 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 2
18.07.1996 Claims Opposition 1
18.07.1996 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
18.07.1996 Translation of the claims Opposition 1
18.07.1996 Translation of the claims Opposition 1
10.06.1996 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
10.06.1996 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
10.06.1996 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
03.06.1996 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 2
14.03.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.03.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.03.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
08.03.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
06.03.1996 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
04.03.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.03.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.03.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
02.03.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.03.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.03.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
29.02.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
27.02.1996 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
27.02.1996 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 1
27.02.1996 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.02.1996 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.02.1996 Means of redress Opposition 1
27.02.1996 Text intended for grant Opposition 8
21.02.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
20.02.1996 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
15.02.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.02.1996 Claims Opposition 1
07.02.1996 Description Opposition 8
07.02.1996 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
21.11.1995 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
13.11.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
13.11.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
27.09.1995 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
27.09.1995 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
19.09.1995 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.09.1995 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
21.08.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.08.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.08.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
10.08.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
05.04.1995 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.04.1995 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
31.03.1995 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
31.03.1995 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
31.03.1995 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 8
28.03.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.03.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
24.03.1995 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
24.03.1995 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
22.03.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
21.03.1995 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
21.03.1995 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.03.1995 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
18.01.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
09.09.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.09.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.08.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
25.01.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.01.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 16
19.10.1993 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
14.10.1993 Claims Appeal 1
14.10.1993 Claims Appeal 1
14.10.1993 Description Appeal 5
14.10.1993 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 14
16.09.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.09.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
31.08.1993 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
19.08.1993 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.08.1993 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
05.08.1993 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
16.06.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
15.06.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.06.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.06.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.06.1993 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
09.06.1993 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
09.06.1993 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 10
09.06.1993 Means of redress Opposition 1
06.04.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.03.1993 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
12.02.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
09.02.1993 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
08.02.1993 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
28.09.1992 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
28.09.1992 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
18.09.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.09.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
20.08.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.08.1992 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 7
06.02.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.02.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.01.1992 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
31.01.1992 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 5
29.01.1992 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 6
05.12.1991 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
27.11.1991 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
26.11.1991 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.07.1991 Annex to the communication Opposition 5
19.07.1991 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
26.02.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.02.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
15.02.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
20.12.1990 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.12.1990 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
28.08.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
18.07.1990 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.07.1990 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
12.07.1990 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
04.07.1990 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
29.06.1990 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
29.06.1990 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
27.06.1990 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
21.06.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.06.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.06.1990 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
13.06.1990 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 19
05.06.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.05.1990 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
29.03.1990 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
28.03.1990 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
27.03.1990 Note on telephone consultation Appeal 1
23.03.1990 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
23.03.1990 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
23.03.1990 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 5
20.03.1990 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
17.03.1990 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.03.1990 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
16.03.1990 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.03.1990 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.03.1990 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
01.03.1990 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
26.07.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.07.1989 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 20
10.05.1989 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
10.05.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.04.1989 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
10.01.1989 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
30.12.1988 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.12.1988 Claims Appeal 3
30.12.1988 Claims Appeal 3
30.12.1988 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
13.12.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
08.12.1988 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.10.1988 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
15.10.1988 Processing of an appeal Opposition 1
12.10.1988 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
03.09.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.09.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
31.08.1988 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
31.08.1988 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
31.08.1988 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
31.08.1988 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
31.08.1988 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 10
31.08.1988 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
23.06.1988 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
28.04.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
28.04.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.04.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
27.04.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
25.04.1988 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
25.04.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
25.04.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
24.03.1988 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.02.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.12.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.12.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.12.1987 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 8
20.11.1987 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
27.10.1987 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
04.09.1987 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
26.06.1987 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 2
17.06.1987 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
18.02.1987 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 2
10.02.1987 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
24.01.1987 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
24.01.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.01.1987 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
15.01.1987 N/A Opposition 1
03.01.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
03.01.1987 Notice of opposition Opposition 12
03.01.1987 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
03.01.1987 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
18.09.1986 Refund of fees Search / examination 2
28.02.1986 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.12.1985 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
12.12.1985 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
12.12.1985 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
30.09.1985 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
24.09.1985 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
20.09.1985 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
20.09.1985 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
12.08.1985 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
12.03.1985 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
16.11.1984 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
03.09.1984 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.09.1984 European search report Search / examination 2
15.06.1984 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
27.10.1983 Request for correction Search / examination 1
09.08.1983 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
05.11.1982 EPO/applicant correspondence crossed Search / examination 1
27.10.1982 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
27.10.1982 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
26.10.1982 Invitation to file authorisation Search / examination 1
13.10.1982 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
13.10.1982 Priority document Search / examination 16
28.09.1982 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.09.1982 Claims Search / examination 4
28.09.1982 Description Search / examination 10
28.09.1982 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.09.1982 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 12
21.08.1977 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1