blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0082928

EP0082928 - Magnetic ink character recognition apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.1987
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.1987No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.01.1988 [1988/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1983/27]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rohrer, Gene Dale
2053 High Ridge Lane
Concord North Carolina 28025 / US
[1983/27]
Representative(s)Atchley, Martin John Waldegrave
IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester
Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1983/32]Atchley, Martin John Waldegrave
IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park
Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Former [1983/27]Petersen, Richard Courtenay
IBM United Kingdom Patent Operations Hursley Park
Winchester Hants. SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date82109184.005.10.1982
[1983/27]
Priority number, dateUS1981033548229.12.1981         Original published format: US 335482
[1983/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0082928
Date:06.07.1983
Language:EN
[1983/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0082928
Date:16.05.1984
Language:EN
[1984/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0082928
Date:30.12.1986
Language:EN
[1986/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.03.1984
ClassificationIPC:G06K9/03, G06K13/067
[1984/18]
CPC:
G06V30/2253 (EP,US); G06V30/12 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1983/27]G06K9/03
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1983/27]
TitleGerman:Erkennungsgerät für Zeichen mit magnetischer Tinte[1983/27]
English:Magnetic ink character recognition apparatus[1983/27]
French:Appareil de reconnaissance de caractères à encre magnétique[1983/27]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure21.10.1983Examination requested  [1983/52]
21.05.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.10.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
10.04.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.04.1986Fee for grant paid
21.04.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.10.1987No opposition filed within time limit [1988/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
29.10.1986Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3140466  (GREANIAS EVON C, et al);
 [A]US3629822  (JOHNSON DONN A);
 [A]DE2544516  (TRIUMPH WERKE NUERNBERG AG);
 [A]EP0024156  (NCR CANADA [CA])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.