blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0077502

EP0077502 - Hydrogen peroxide adduct, process for its manufacture and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.11.1985
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.1985No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.01.1986 [1986/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Peroxid-Chemie GmbH
Dr.Gustav-Adolf-Strasse 3
W-8023 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
[1983/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Dötsch, Werner, Dr. Dipl.-Chem.
Kreuzgasse 3
D-5462 Bad Hönningen / DE
02 / Honig, Helmut, Dr.rer.nat. Dipl-Chem.
Kranzlstrasse 14
D-8191 Gelting / DE
03 / Siegel, Rudolf
Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 8
D-5450 Neuwied 13 / DE
[1983/17]
Representative(s)Lauer, Dieter
c/o Kali-Chemie Aktiengesellschaft
Hans-Böckler-Allee 20
30173 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [1983/17]Lauer, Dieter, Dr.
c/o Kali-Chemie Aktiengesellschaft Hans-Böckler-Allee 20
D-30173 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date82109312.708.10.1982
[1983/17]
Priority number, dateDE1981314115216.10.1981         Original published format: DE 3141152
[1983/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0077502
Date:27.04.1983
Language:DE
[1983/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0077502
Date:09.01.1985
Language:DE
[1985/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.02.1983
ClassificationIPC:C01B15/08
[1983/17]
CPC:
C01B15/06 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1983/17]
TitleGerman:Wasserstoffperoxid-Addukt, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und seine Verwendung[1983/17]
English:Hydrogen peroxide adduct, process for its manufacture and its use[1983/17]
French:Produit d'addition du peroxyde d'hydrogène, procédé de fabrication et utilisation[1983/17]
Examination procedure11.05.1983Examination requested  [1983/30]
17.04.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
28.06.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.07.1984Fee for grant paid
06.07.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.10.1985No opposition filed within time limit [1986/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2277885  (KAO CORP [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.