Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0083727

EP0083727 - Amplitude modulator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1983/29]Digital amplitude modulator
[1987/20]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  19.09.1997
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2009Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 24.06.2009  [2009/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HARRIS CORPORATION
1025 West NASA Boulevard
Melbourne, FL 32919 / US
[N/P]
Former [1983/29]For all designated states
HARRIS CORPORATION
1025 West NASA Boulevard
Melbourne Florida 32912 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Swanson, Hilmer I
Ellington Road
Quincy, Illinois 62301 / US
[1983/29]
Representative(s)Liesegang, Roland , et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Liesegang, Roland , et al
Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [1997/45]Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing. , et al
BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, NORDEMANN und PARTNER Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Former [1989/05]Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7
D-81241 München / DE
Former [1986/44]Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Prinz, Leiser, Bunke & Partner Manzingerweg 7
D-8000 München 60 / DE
Former [1983/29]Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing.
Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7
D-81241 München / DE
Application number, filing date82111126.702.12.1982
[1983/29]
Priority number, dateUS1981033408324.12.1981         Original published format: US 334083
[1983/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0083727
Date:20.07.1983
Language:EN
[1983/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0083727
Date:13.05.1987
Language:EN
[1987/20]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0083727
Date:05.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.04.1983
ClassificationInternational:H03F3/217, H03C1/00, H03F3/24
[1987/20]
Former International [1983/29]H03F1/06, H03C1/00, H03F3/24
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   LI [1983/29]
TitleGerman:Amplitudemodulator[1987/20]
English:Amplitude modulator[1987/20]
French:Modulateur d'amplitude[1987/20]
Former [1983/29]Digitaler Amplitudemodulator
Former [1983/29]Digital amplitude modulator
Former [1983/29]Modulateur d'amplitude à commande numérique
Examination procedure07.12.1983Examination requested  [1984/07]
30.08.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.03.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
25.07.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.1986Fee for grant paid
08.10.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.02.1988  26.04.1988  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Management AG
CH-5401 Baden / CH
Opponent's representative
Ottow, Jens M.
Isler & Pedrazzini AG
Gotthardstrasse 53
Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
 02  09.02.1988  16.03.1988  ADMISSIBLE
Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft
70327 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Fröhling, Werner Otto
Daimler-Benz Aerospace AG
Patentabteilung
Wörthstrasse 85
89077 Ulm / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/26]
Opponent(s)01  08.02.1988  26.04.1988  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Management AG
CH-5401 Baden / CH
Opponent's representative
Ottow, Jens M.
Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
 02  09.02.1988  16.03.1988  ADMISSIBLE
Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft
70327 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Fröhling, Werner Otto
Daimler-Benz Aerospace AG Patentabteilung Wörthstrasse 85
89077 Ulm / DE
Former [2008/44]
Opponent(s)01  08.02.1988  26.04.1988  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Management AG
CH-5401 Baden / CH
Opponent's representative
Ottow, Jens M.
Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
 02  09.02.1988  16.03.1988  ADMISSIBLE
Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft
70327 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Fröhling, Werner, Dr.
Daimler-Benz Aerospace AG Patentabteilung Wörthstrasse 85
D-89077 Ulm / DE
Former [1997/21]
Opponent(s)01  08.02.1988  26.04.1988  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Management AG
CH-5401 Baden / CH
Opponent's representative
Ottow, Jens M., Dr.
Hug Interlizenz AG Nordstrasse 31
CH-8045 Zürich / CH
 02  09.02.1988  16.03.1988  ADMISSIBLE
Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft
70327 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Fröhling, Werner, Dr.
Daimler-Benz Aerospace AG Patentabteilung Wörthstrasse 85
D-89077 Ulm / DE
Former [1995/29]
Opponent(s)01  08.02.1988  26.04.1988  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Management AG
CH-5401 Baden / CH
Opponent's representative
Ottow, Jens M., Dr.
Hug Interlizenz AG Nordstrasse 31
CH-8045 Zürich / CH
 02  09.02.1988  16.03.1988  ADMISSIBLE
AEG Aktiengesellschaft Berlin und Frankfurt
PTL
D-60591 Frankfurt / DE
Opponent's representative
Fröhling, Werner, Dr.
Daimler-Benz Aerospace AG Patentabteilung Wörthstrasse 85
D-89077 Ulm / DE
Former [1994/16]
Opponent(s)01  08.02.1988  26.04.1988  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Management AG
CH-5401 Baden / CH
Opponent's representative
Ottow, Jens M., Dr.
Hug Interlizenz AG Nordstrasse 31
CH-8045 Zürich / CH
 02  09.02.1988  16.03.1988  ADMISSIBLE
AEG Aktiengesellschaft Berlin und Frankfurt
PTL
D-60591 Frankfurt / DE
Opponent's representative
Schulze, Harald Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing.
Daimler-Benz Aerospace AG Patentabteilung Sedanstrasse 10
D-89077 Ulm / DE
Former [1994/08]
Opponent(s)01  08.02.1988  26.04.1988  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Management AG
CH-5401 Baden / CH
 02  09.02.1988  16.03.1988  ADMISSIBLE
AEG Aktiengesellschaft Berlin und Frankfurt
PTL
D-60591 Frankfurt / DE
Opponent's representative
Schulze, Harald Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing.
Daimler-Benz Aerospace AG Patentabteilung Sedanstrasse 10
D-89077 Ulm / DE
Former [1993/06]
Opponent(s)01  08.02.1988  26.04.1988  ADMISSIBLE
Asea Brown Boveri AG
Haslerstr.16 Postfach
CH-5401 Baden / CH
 02  09.02.1988  16.03.1988  ADMISSIBLE
AEG Aktiengesellschaft Berlin und Frankfurt
PTL
D-60591 Frankfurt / DE
Opponent's representative
Schulze, Harald Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing.
Daimler-Benz Aerospace AG Patentabteilung Sedanstrasse 10
D-89077 Ulm / DE
Former [1988/18]
Opponent(s)01  08.02.1988   
Asea Brown Boveri AG
Haslerstr.16 Postfach
CH-5401 Baden / CH
 02  09.02.1988  16.03.1988  ADMISSIBLE
AEG Aktiengesellschaft Berlin und Frankfurt
PTL
D-60591 Frankfurt / DE
Former [1988/14]
Opponent(s)01  08.02.1988   
Asea Brown Boveri AG
Haslerstr.16 Postfach
CH-5401 Baden / CH
28.04.1988Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.12.1988Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.01.1989Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
02.03.1989Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
19.10.1989Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
24.04.1990Reply to a communication from the opposition division
30.01.1991Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
04.06.1991Reply to a communication from the opposition division
25.01.1993Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M10)
25.11.1993Reply to a communication from the opposition division
12.12.1994Date of oral proceedings
31.03.1995Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.01.1997Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
07.04.1997Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.06.1997Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
29.08.1997Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition24.05.1995Appeal received No.  T0463/95
19.07.1995Statement of grounds filed
29.01.1997Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
29.01.1997Date of oral proceedings
05.02.1997Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:13.03.1986Request for further processing filed
13.03.1986Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.03.1986Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.1986Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB2064901  ;
 [Y]US2379513  ;
 [A]US3406352  ;
 [A]US4249135  ;
 [A]EP0025234  ;
 [A]DE1953755