Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0083727 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0083727



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 858
15.06.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
19.05.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
22.09.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
22.09.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
15.11.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.09.1997 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
25.09.1997 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
25.09.1997 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
19.09.1997 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
29.08.1997 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
29.08.1997 Translation of the claims Opposition 9
29.08.1997 Translation of the claims Opposition 8
04.06.1997 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
04.06.1997 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
04.06.1997 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 1
04.06.1997 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 1
04.06.1997 Text intended for grant Opposition 23
08.04.1997 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 3
07.04.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
07.04.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
07.04.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
04.04.1997 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
05.02.1997 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
05.02.1997 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
05.02.1997 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
29.01.1997 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 26
29.01.1997 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 6
17.01.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.01.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.01.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
07.01.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.01.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.01.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.01.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
02.01.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
31.12.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
31.12.1996 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 26
31.12.1996 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
31.12.1996 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
27.12.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 42
19.12.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
19.12.1996 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
19.12.1996 Claims Appeal 1
19.12.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
19.12.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
13.12.1996 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
13.12.1996 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
12.12.1996 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
29.11.1996 Decision revoking the European patent Appeal 1
29.11.1996 Decision revoking the European patent Appeal 1
22.11.1996 Claims Appeal 1
22.11.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
19.09.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
19.09.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.09.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.09.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.09.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
13.09.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
13.09.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
13.09.1996 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
11.09.1996 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
21.08.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
21.08.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
21.08.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
06.12.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.12.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.11.1995 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.11.1995 Claims Appeal 1
29.11.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
15.11.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.11.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
27.07.1995 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.07.1995 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.07.1995 Claims Appeal 8
10.07.1995 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
22.06.1995 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
19.06.1995 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
14.06.1995 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
14.06.1995 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
06.06.1995 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.06.1995 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.06.1995 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.1995 Processing of an appeal Opposition 1
24.05.1995 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
21.04.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.04.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
07.04.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
07.04.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.04.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
31.03.1995 Annex to a communication Opposition 8
31.03.1995 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
31.03.1995 Annex to a communication Opposition 7
31.03.1995 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
31.03.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 6
31.03.1995 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
31.03.1995 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
31.03.1995 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 13
31.03.1995 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.03.1995 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.03.1995 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.03.1995 Means of redress Opposition 1
31.03.1995 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
31.03.1995 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.03.1995 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.03.1995 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.03.1995 Text intended for grant Opposition 22
19.01.1995 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
09.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.12.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.12.1994 Claims Opposition 1
05.12.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.12.1994 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
05.12.1994 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.11.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.11.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.11.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.11.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
08.11.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
15.09.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.09.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.08.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
30.08.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
25.08.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.08.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.08.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.08.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.08.1994 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
19.08.1994 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
19.08.1994 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
08.08.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
05.08.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
18.07.1994 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.07.1994 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.07.1994 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.07.1994 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.04.1994 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
17.03.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.03.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.01.1994 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
15.01.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.01.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.01.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.01.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.01.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
17.12.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
29.11.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
29.11.1993 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.11.1993 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.09.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.09.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
11.09.1993 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
25.08.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.08.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.08.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
27.07.1993 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
20.07.1993 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
15.06.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.06.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.06.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
25.05.1993 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
21.05.1993 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
25.01.1993 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
25.01.1993 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
28.12.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.12.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.12.1992 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
13.11.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.11.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.11.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.11.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
11.11.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.11.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.11.1992 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
06.11.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.11.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.11.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.11.1992 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 3
04.11.1992 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
30.10.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.10.1992 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
29.10.1992 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
27.10.1992 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
28.08.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.08.1992 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
22.08.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.08.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.08.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.08.1992 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
18.08.1992 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
18.08.1992 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
18.08.1992 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
17.08.1992 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
28.07.1992 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
24.07.1992 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
20.07.1992 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
20.07.1992 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
20.07.1992 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
20.07.1992 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.07.1992 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.07.1992 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.07.1992 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.07.1992 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.07.1992 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.07.1992 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.06.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
10.06.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
04.06.1991 Claims Opposition 3
04.06.1991 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.06.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
22.05.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
16.05.1991 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
30.01.1991 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
30.01.1991 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
21.05.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
24.04.1990 Claims Opposition 7
24.04.1990 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
23.02.1990 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
15.02.1990 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
05.02.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
24.01.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
19.10.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
19.10.1989 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
09.03.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
02.03.1989 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 5
27.02.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
20.02.1989 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 3
13.01.1989 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
13.01.1989 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
29.12.1988 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
04.11.1988 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
29.10.1988 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
02.09.1988 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
25.08.1988 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
28.04.1988 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
28.04.1988 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
28.04.1988 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
30.03.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.03.1988 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
23.02.1988 Request for documents Opposition 1
19.02.1988 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
09.02.1988 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
08.02.1988 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
08.02.1988 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
18.05.1987 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
03.04.1987 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
05.02.1987 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
08.10.1986 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
08.10.1986 Translation of the claims Search / examination 7
08.10.1986 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
19.08.1986 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
25.07.1986 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
04.07.1986 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
12.06.1986 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.06.1986 Text intended for grant Search / examination 68
12.05.1986 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.05.1986 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 3
27.03.1986 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
13.03.1986 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
12.03.1986 Claims Search / examination 7
12.03.1986 Description Search / examination 4
21.01.1986 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.12.1985 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.08.1985 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
07.12.1983 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
27.07.1983 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
03.06.1983 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 2
03.06.1983 Invitation to file authorisation Search / examination 2
03.06.1983 Invitation to remedy deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 2
25.05.1983 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
17.05.1983 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
27.04.1983 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
27.04.1983 European search report Search / examination 2
02.02.1983 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
02.02.1983 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.02.1983 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.12.1982 Drawings Search / examination 5
21.12.1982 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
21.12.1982 Priority document Search / examination 62
02.12.1982 Abstract Search / examination 1
02.12.1982 Claims Search / examination 17
02.12.1982 Description Search / examination 37
02.12.1982 Drawings Search / examination 5
02.12.1982 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 11