blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0083089

EP0083089 - Process for forming self-aligned metallization patterns for semiconductor devices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.1989
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.1989No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.05.1989 [1989/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1983/27]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Abbas, Shakir Ahmed
Brothers Road
Wappingers Falls New York 12590 / US
02 / Magdo, Ingrid Emese
Frances Drive
Hopewell Junction New York 12533 / US
[1983/27]
Representative(s)Möhlen, Wolfgang
IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4
8803 Rüschlikon / CH
[N/P]
Former [1983/27]Möhlen, Wolfgang C., Dipl.-Ing.
IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4
CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH
Application number, filing date82111971.627.12.1982
[1983/27]
Priority number, dateUS1981033589430.12.1981         Original published format: US 335894
[1983/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0083089
Date:06.07.1983
Language:EN
[1983/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0083089
Date:23.01.1985
Language:EN
[1985/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0083089
Date:01.06.1988
Language:EN
[1988/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.11.1984
ClassificationIPC:H01L21/60, H01L23/48
[1983/27]
CPC:
H10D10/051 (EP,US); H01L21/033 (EP,US); H01L21/76801 (EP,US);
H01L21/76832 (EP,US); H01L23/485 (EP,US); H10D30/0223 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US); H10D64/017 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1983/27]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Herstellen eines selbstausrichtenden metallischen Musters für Halbleiteranordnungen[1983/27]
English:Process for forming self-aligned metallization patterns for semiconductor devices[1983/27]
French:Procédé pour la fabrication d'une configuration métallique par auto-alignement pour dispositifs semi-conducteurs[1983/27]
File destroyed:15.01.2000
Examination procedure21.10.1983Examination requested  [1983/52]
28.08.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
24.11.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.01.1988Fee for grant paid
12.01.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.03.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1989/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.1986Renewal fee patent year 05
11.12.1987Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2328288  (PHILIPS NV [NL])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.