Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0072602

EP0072602 - Servomotor for assisted braking [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  11.08.1989
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BENDIX France
126, rue de Stalingrad
F-93700 Drancy / FR
[1986/25]
Former [1986/11]For all designated states
BENDIX France
126, rue de Stalingrad
F-93700 Drancy / FR
Former [1985/39]For all designated states
BENDIX France
126, rue de Stalingrad
F-93700 Drancy / FR
Former [1983/08]For all designated states
SOCIETE ANONYME D.B.A.
Centre Paris Pleyel
F-93521 St-Denis Cédex 01 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Carré, Jean-Jacques
59 Blvd de l'Est
F-93340 Le Raincy / FR
02 / Meyer, Yves
3 allée du Pré Fleuri
F-95150 Taverny / FR
[1983/08]
Representative(s)Lejet, Christian , et al
BENDIX FRANCE Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126 rue de Stalingrad
93700 Drancy / FR
[N/P]
Former [1988/39]Lejet, Christian , et al
BENDIX FRANCE Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126 rue de Stalingrad
F-93700 Drancy / FR
Former [1983/08]Le Moenner, Gabriel
Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad
F-93700 Drancy / FR
Application number, filing date82201182.113.06.1980
[1983/08]
Priority number, dateFR1979001541315.06.1979         Original published format: FR 7915413
[1983/08]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0072602
Date:23.02.1983
Language:FR
[1983/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0072602
Date:20.07.1983
Language:FR
[1983/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.05.1983
ClassificationInternational:B60T13/24
[1983/08]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1983/08]
TitleGerman:Servomotor für Hilfskraftbremsen[1983/08]
English:Servomotor for assisted braking[1983/08]
French:Servomoteur d'assistance au freinage[1983/08]
Examination procedure24.09.1982Examination requested  [1983/08]
17.10.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.10.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.03.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.1985Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1989/39]
14.12.1985Application refused, date of legal effect [1989/39]
Appeal following examination10.01.1986Appeal received No.  T0058/86
10.01.1986Statement of grounds filed
05.07.1988Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M03) [1988/28]
07.10.1988Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1988/41]
26.04.1989Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
26.04.1989Date of oral proceedings
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP80400867.0  / EP0021969
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.1982Renewal fee patent year 03
17.06.1983Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.1984Renewal fee patent year 05
22.05.1985Renewal fee patent year 06
15.05.1986Renewal fee patent year 07
14.05.1987Renewal fee patent year 08
14.06.1988Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2325833  ;
 [A]FR1527482  ;
 [A]FR1558653  ;
 [A]FR2076172  ;
 [A]FR2225319  ;
 [A]FR1230198  ;
 [A]FR2283804