Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0079102 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0079102



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 290
03.07.2008 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
09.03.1994 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.11.1992 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
06.11.1992 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
06.11.1992 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
05.11.1992 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
02.10.1992 Request for change of address of the applicant Search / examination 1
28.09.1992 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
28.09.1992 Translation of the claims Opposition 2
28.09.1992 Translation of the claims Opposition 2
05.09.1992 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
26.06.1992 Communication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
26.06.1992 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
26.06.1992 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Search / examination 2
19.06.1992 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
15.06.1992 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.06.1992 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.04.1992 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
15.04.1992 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
08.04.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 8
08.04.1992 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
03.04.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.04.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.03.1992 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
27.03.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.03.1992 Submission concerning representation Appeal 1
21.03.1992 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.03.1992 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 1
07.02.1992 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
11.01.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
11.01.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.10.1991 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
29.10.1991 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
21.10.1991 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.10.1991 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.10.1991 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.10.1991 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
09.10.1991 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
09.10.1991 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
10.08.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.08.1990 Authorisation Appeal 1
06.08.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
09.07.1990 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
02.05.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.04.1990 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.04.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
19.04.1990 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.04.1990 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
23.03.1990 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
23.03.1990 Notice of appeal Appeal 5
03.02.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
03.02.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
31.01.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
25.01.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
25.01.1990 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 7
25.01.1990 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
25.01.1990 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
25.01.1990 Means of redress Opposition 1
22.12.1989 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 2
26.07.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.07.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.06.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
31.05.1989 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
17.05.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
17.05.1989 Communication inviting to file observations after oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.05.1989 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
17.05.1989 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
17.05.1989 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.05.1989 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.05.1989 Text intended for grant Opposition 4
25.03.1989 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
25.03.1989 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.01.1989 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 2
19.09.1988 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
13.09.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.09.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
11.08.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.08.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
08.07.1988 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 2
30.06.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
23.06.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
23.06.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.06.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.06.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.06.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.06.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.06.1988 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
09.05.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
09.05.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
28.02.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.02.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.02.1988 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 6
30.09.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.09.1987 Claims Opposition 1
24.09.1987 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.1987 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
08.09.1987 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 1
18.08.1987 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
07.07.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.05.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
22.05.1987 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 3
05.03.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
23.02.1987 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.12.1986 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 2
06.11.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.11.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
06.11.1986 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
08.07.1986 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
23.05.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.05.1986 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
21.04.1986 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
09.04.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.04.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.04.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.04.1986 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
11.07.1985 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.03.1985 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
29.03.1985 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
29.03.1985 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
15.02.1985 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
06.02.1985 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
09.01.1985 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.01.1985 Text intended for grant Search / examination 10
14.12.1984 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
05.11.1984 Claims Search / examination 1
05.11.1984 Description Search / examination 2
05.11.1984 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.07.1984 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.05.1983 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
22.03.1983 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
09.03.1983 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.03.1983 European search report Search / examination 1
03.11.1982 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.11.1982 Claims Search / examination 2
03.11.1982 Description Search / examination 8
03.11.1982 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.11.1982 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.11.1982 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
03.11.1982 Priority document Search / examination 12
03.11.1982 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 11