blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0083142

EP0083142 - A method of making up dough and a dough make-up machine for performing the method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.06.1987
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.1987No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.07.1987 [1987/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Benier B.V.
Ketelaarskampweg 9
NL-5222 AL 's-Hertogenbosch / NL
[1983/27]
Inventor(s)01 / Benier, Johan
Nieuwe Erven 15
NL-5263 AR Vught / NL
[1983/27]
Representative(s)Urbanus, Henricus Maria, et al
c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107
2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL
[N/P]
Former [1983/27]Urbanus, Henricus Maria, Ir., et al
c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107
NL-2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL
Application number, filing date82201673.929.12.1982
[1983/27]
Priority number, dateNL1981000589329.12.1981         Original published format: NL 8105893
[1983/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0083142
Date:06.07.1983
Language:EN
[1983/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0083142
Date:13.08.1986
Language:EN
[1986/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.05.1983
ClassificationIPC:A21C3/02, A21C3/06
[1983/27]
CPC:
A21C3/06 (EP,US); A21C3/02 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1983/27]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Formen von Teig und Formmaschine zur Durchführung des Verfahrens[1983/27]
English:A method of making up dough and a dough make-up machine for performing the method[1983/27]
French:Procédé pour façonner la pâte et machine à façonner pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé[1983/27]
Examination procedure20.12.1983Examination requested  [1984/10]
15.11.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.03.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.09.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
13.02.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.05.1986Fee for grant paid
22.05.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.05.1987No opposition filed within time limit [1987/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
30.12.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XD]FR373646  (JEAN BAPTISTE LAFFOND [FR]);
 [X]US2246477  (ATTAWAY WILLIAM H, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.