EP0062975 - Optical recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1986 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.1986 [1986/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/42] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mashita, Masao 1277, Yabe-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | 02 /
Yasuda, Nobuaki 2-28-19, Ikego Zushi-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Ishibashi, Satoshi 2-6-10, Johoku-Shinmachi Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [1982/42] | Representative(s) | Freed, Arthur Woolf, et al Marks & Clerk Incorporating Edward Evans Barker 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/42] | Freed, Arthur Woolf, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 82301410.5 | 18.03.1982 | [1982/42] | Priority number, date | JP19810049392 | 03.04.1981 Original published format: JP 4939281 | [1982/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0062975 | Date: | 20.10.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0062975 | Date: | 10.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, B41M5/24 | [1982/42] | CPC: |
G11B7/258 (EP,US);
G11B7/00451 (EP,US);
G11B7/2403 (EP,US);
G11B7/24053 (EP,US);
G11B7/243 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24316 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24328 (EP,US);
G11B2007/25706 (EP,US);
G11B7/2531 (EP,US);
G11B7/2533 (EP,US);
G11B7/2542 (EP,US);
G11B7/2578 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1982/42] | Title | German: | Optischer Aufzeichnungsträger | [1982/42] | English: | Optical recording medium | [1982/42] | French: | Support d'enregistrement optique | [1982/42] | Examination procedure | 24.03.1982 | Examination requested [1982/42] | 08.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP55163638 ; | [AP]JP56003442 ; | [A]EP0023674 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]DE2939524 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]EP0025253 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [Y]DE2441488 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]GB2009996 (PHILIPS NV) | [Y] - IEEE SPECTRUM, Vol. 16, No. 2, February 1979, New York, G.C. KENNEY et al.: "An Optical Disk replaces 25 Mag Tapes" pages 33 to 38 | [Y] - Patent Abstracts of Japan, Vol. 5, No. 42, 20 March 1981 & JP-A-55 163 638 (19-12-1980), & JP55163638 A 19810320 | [AP] - Patent Abstracts of Japan, Vol. 5, No. 48, 7 April 1981 & JP-A-56 003 442 (14-01-1981), & JP56003442 A 19810407 |