Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0078093

EP0078093 - Device for imparting continuous passive motion to human joints [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  17.12.1991
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TORONTO MEDICAL CORP.
901 Dillingham Road Pickering
Ontario L1W 2Y5 / CA
[N/P]
Former [1986/31]For all designated states
TORONTO MEDICAL CORP.
901 Dillingham Road
Pickering, Ontario L1W 2Y5 / CA
Former [1983/18]For all designated states
IMASCO-CDC RESEARCH FOUNDATION
Suite 200 444 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 2H4 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Saringer, John H.
32 Gifford Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 3J1 / CA
[1983/18]
Representative(s)Smith, Norman Ian , et al
Cleveland
40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1986/31]Smith, Norman Ian , et al
F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
Former [1983/18]Newens, Leonard Eric
F.J. CLEVELAND & CO. 40/43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
Application number, filing date82302019.320.04.1982
[1983/18]
Priority number, dateCA1981038865923.10.1981         Original published format: CA 388659
[1983/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0078093
Date:04.05.1983
Language:EN
[1983/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0078093
Date:28.03.1984
Language:EN
[1984/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0078093
Date:01.07.1987
Language:EN
[1987/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.1984
ClassificationInternational:A61H1/02
[1983/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1983/18]
TitleGerman:Einrichtung zum Erteilen einer kontinuierlichen passiven Bewegung an menschlichen Gelenken[1983/18]
English:Device for imparting continuous passive motion to human joints[1983/18]
French:Dispositif appliquant aux articulations humaines un mouvement continu, passif[1983/18]
Examination procedure23.03.1984New documents discovered [1984/22]
28.08.1984Examination requested  [1984/45]
22.07.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.05.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
02.01.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.01.1987Fee for grant paid
23.01.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.03.1988   
COMPAGNIE GENERALE DE MATERIEL ORTHOPEDIQUE Société Anonyme Française
Zone Industrielle B.P. 19
F-08540 Tournes Cliron / FR
Opponent's representative
Ropital-Bonvarlet, Claude
Cabinet BEAU DE LOMENIE 51, avenue Jean-Jaurès B.P. 7073
69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR
 [N/P]
Former [1988/22]
Opponent(s)01  24.03.1988   
COMPAGNIE GENERALE DE MATERIEL ORTHOPEDIQUE Société Anonyme Française
Zone Industrielle B.P. 19
F-08540 Tournes Cliron / FR
Opponent's representative
Ropital-Bonvarlet, Claude
Cabinet BEAU DE LOMENIE 51, avenue Jean-Jaurès B.P. 7073
F-69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR
06.06.1988Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.12.1988Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.12.1988Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
07.04.1989Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
21.11.1989Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
17.10.1991Legal effect of revocation of patent [1992/06]
Appeal following opposition12.01.1990Appeal received No.  T0071/90
30.03.1990Statement of grounds filed
17.10.1991Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
17.10.1991Date of oral proceedings
28.10.1991Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.04.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
01.04.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
18.04.1986Renewal fee patent year 05
03.04.1987Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2015/21]
Former [1992/16]CH01.07.1987
LI01.07.1987
Documents cited:Search[X]US3323518  (SWANSON HOWARD M);
 [X]US3976057  (BARCLAY DOLTIE W);
 [X]DE191678  ;
 [A]US3824994  (SODERBERG R);
 [A]FR2109426  (MASMONTEIL HENRI)