Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0078093 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0078093



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 832
17.12.1991 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
04.12.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
04.12.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
27.11.1991 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
27.11.1991 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
27.11.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.11.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.10.1991 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
28.10.1991 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
17.10.1991 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 15
17.10.1991 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
27.09.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.09.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.09.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
19.09.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
19.09.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
19.09.1991 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.09.1991 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
16.09.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 12
11.09.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 12
23.07.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.07.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
01.07.1991 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.06.1991 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.06.1991 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.06.1991 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
20.06.1991 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
18.06.1991 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
11.06.1991 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.03.1991 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
05.03.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
05.03.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 28
08.01.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.12.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
26.10.1990 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
08.10.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.10.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
06.08.1990 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
06.08.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.07.1990 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
10.04.1990 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
09.04.1990 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
30.03.1990 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
30.03.1990 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 9
30.03.1990 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.03.1990 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
30.03.1990 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.03.1990 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 12
30.03.1990 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.03.1990 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
23.03.1990 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
22.03.1990 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
12.01.1990 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
28.11.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.11.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.11.1989 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
21.11.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
21.11.1989 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
21.11.1989 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
21.11.1989 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 5
21.11.1989 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 1
21.11.1989 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 1
21.11.1989 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.1989 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.11.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.11.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
08.11.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.10.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.09.1989 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
23.09.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
13.09.1989 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.09.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
06.09.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.09.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.08.1989 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.1989 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
30.08.1989 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
21.08.1989 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.08.1989 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
03.08.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.08.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 3
01.08.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.08.1989 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
01.08.1989 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
01.08.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
25.07.1989 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
25.07.1989 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
10.07.1989 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
10.07.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
07.07.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
05.07.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
28.06.1989 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.06.1989 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.06.1989 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.06.1989 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 30
26.06.1989 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 30
27.04.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.04.1989 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 7
26.01.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.01.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
18.01.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.01.1989 Request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.12.1988 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
03.12.1988 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
15.10.1988 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
07.10.1988 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
06.06.1988 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
06.06.1988 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
10.05.1988 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
10.05.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.04.1988 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
19.04.1988 N/A Opposition 1
28.03.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 10
28.03.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
28.03.1988 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
28.03.1988 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 12
28.03.1988 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 4
28.03.1988 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 14
28.03.1988 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 8
28.03.1988 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 16
28.03.1988 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 10
28.03.1988 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 28
28.03.1988 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
28.03.1988 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
28.03.1988 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
28.03.1988 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
28.03.1988 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.03.1988 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
28.03.1988 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
28.03.1988 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.03.1988 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
28.03.1988 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
28.03.1988 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
28.03.1988 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
28.03.1988 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
24.03.1988 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
20.05.1987 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
02.03.1987 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.03.1987 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
02.03.1987 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
02.01.1987 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
05.12.1986 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
05.12.1986 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
09.10.1986 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.10.1986 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
02.10.1986 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
19.08.1986 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
19.08.1986 General authorisation Search / examination 1
19.07.1986 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
19.07.1986 General authorisation Search / examination 1
12.06.1986 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
16.05.1986 Claims Search / examination 2
16.05.1986 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.05.1986 Request for assignment Search / examination 5
06.02.1986 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
12.11.1985 Claims Search / examination 6
12.11.1985 Description Search / examination 3
12.11.1985 Drawings Search / examination 2
12.11.1985 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.07.1985 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
22.07.1985 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
12.11.1984 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
12.11.1984 Claims Search / examination 6
12.11.1984 Description Search / examination 9
28.08.1984 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
28.08.1984 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
28.08.1984 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
06.04.1984 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
23.03.1984 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 3
15.03.1984 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
25.01.1984 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.01.1984 European search report Search / examination 2
20.12.1983 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
20.12.1983 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
08.03.1983 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
12.08.1982 Representative not authorised (procedural step deemed not to have taken place) Search / examination 1
22.06.1982 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.06.1982 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
08.06.1982 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
08.06.1982 General authorisation Search / examination 1
03.06.1982 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 2
02.06.1982 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.06.1982 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.06.1982 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.06.1982 Drawings Search / examination 7
02.06.1982 Drawings Search / examination 7
02.06.1982 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
02.06.1982 Priority document Search / examination 20
11.05.1982 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 2
11.05.1982 Invitation to file authorisation Search / examination 2
20.04.1982 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.04.1982 Claims Search / examination 5
20.04.1982 Description Search / examination 8
20.04.1982 Drawings Search / examination 7
20.04.1982 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.04.1982 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10