blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0064410

EP0064410 - Walking aid [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.09.1987
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.1987No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.10.1987 [1987/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Adamson, Alistair Hamish MacGregor
5 Park Road Farnham
Surrey / GB
[N/P]
Former [1982/45]For all designated states
Adamson, Alistair Hamish MacGregor
5 Park Road
Farnham Surrey / GB
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1982/45]
Representative(s)Blatchford, William Michael, et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1985/32]Blatchford, William Michael, et al
Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn
London EC1N 2JT / GB
Former [1982/45]Blatchford, William Charles
WITHERS & ROGERS 4 Dyers Buildings Holborn
London, EC1N 2JT / GB
Application number, filing date82302284.305.05.1982
[1982/45]
Priority number, dateGB1981001365605.05.1981         Original published format: GB 8113656
[1982/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0064410
Date:10.11.1982
Language:EN
[1982/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0064410
Date:25.05.1983
Language:EN
[1983/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0064410
Date:05.11.1986
Language:EN
[1986/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.1983
ClassificationIPC:A61H3/00
[1982/45]
CPC:
A61H3/00 (EP); A61H2201/0161 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   NL,   SE [1982/45]
TitleGerman:Gehhilfe[1982/45]
English:Walking aid[1982/45]
French:Dispositif d'aide pour la marche[1982/45]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure18.11.1983Examination requested  [1984/05]
05.10.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.04.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
02.05.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.1986Fee for grant paid
29.07.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.08.1987No opposition filed within time limit [1987/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.1986Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.198504   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.1985
02.06.198605   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.1986
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US3442276  ;
 [Y]FR2321270  ;
 [A]US4164354  ;
 [A]US3993088
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.