blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0070101

EP0070101 - Mos transistors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.09.1986
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.09.1986No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.11.1986 [1986/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square - 020 Rochester
New York 14644 / US
[N/P]
Former [1983/03]For all designated states
XEROX CORPORATION
Xerox Square - 020
Rochester New York 14644 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rumennik, Vladimir
7742 Redlands Street
Playa Del Ray California 90291 / US
02 / Heald, David L.
976 Ballard Canyon Road
Solvang California 93463 / US
[1983/03]
Representative(s)Weatherald, Keith Baynes, et al
Rank Xerox Limited Patent Department 364 Euston Road
London NW1 3BL / GB
[1983/52]
Former [1983/03]Weatherald, Keith Baynes
Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway
Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB
Application number, filing date82303065.514.06.1982
[1983/03]
Priority number, dateUS1981028210306.07.1981         Original published format: US 282103
[1983/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0070101
Date:19.01.1983
Language:EN
[1983/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0070101
Date:21.11.1985
Language:EN
[1985/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.1982
ClassificationIPC:H01L27/08, H01L29/78
[1983/03]
CPC:
H10D62/364 (EP); H10D30/603 (EP); H10D62/126 (EP);
H10D84/857 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1983/03]
TitleGerman:Mos-Transistoren[1983/03]
English:Mos transistors[1983/03]
French:Transitors du type MOS[1983/03]
Examination procedure13.06.1983Examination requested  [1983/34]
11.07.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
07.05.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.1985Fee for grant paid
24.07.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.08.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1986/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP5563863  ;
 [Y]US3793721  (WAKEFIELD R, et al);
 [A]US4058822  (AWANE KATUNOBU, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.