Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0070156

EP0070156 - Centrifuge apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.1988
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 31.10.2007  [2007/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HAEMONETICS CORPORATION(a Massachusetts Corporation)
400 Wood Road Braintree
Massachusetts 02184 / US
[N/P]
Former [1987/45]For all designated states
HAEMONETICS CORPORATION(a Massachusetts Corporation)
400 Wood Road
Braintree Massachusetts 02184 / US
Former [1983/03]For all designated states
HAEMONETICS CORPORATION
400 Wood Road
Braintree Massachusetts 02184 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Latham, Allen, Jr.
60 Malcolm Road
Jamaica Plain Massachusetts 02130 / US
02 / Schoendorfer, Donald W.
322 Walnut Street
Brookline Massachusetts 02146 / US
[1983/03]
Representative(s)Slight, Geoffrey Charles , et al
Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 2BN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1983/03]Slight, Geoffrey Charles , et al
Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead
Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB
Application number, filing date82303591.008.07.1982
[1983/03]
Priority number, dateUS1981028165009.07.1981         Original published format: US 281650
[1983/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0070156
Date:19.01.1983
Language:EN
[1983/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0070156
Date:20.06.1984
Language:EN
[1984/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0070156
Date:16.12.1987
Language:EN
[1987/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.1984
ClassificationInternational:B04B5/04
[1983/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1983/03]
TitleGerman:Zentrifugen-Apparat[1983/03]
English:Centrifuge apparatus[1983/03]
French:Appareil centrifuge[1983/03]
File destroyed:15.01.2000
Examination procedure30.11.1984Examination requested  [1985/07]
10.02.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.05.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
08.01.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.1987Fee for grant paid
09.03.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.09.1988No opposition filed within time limit [1988/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
18.06.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.1986Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.1987Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.198605   M06   Fee paid on   10.11.1986
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.12.1987
CH16.12.1987
IT16.12.1987
LI16.12.1987
NL16.12.1987
SE31.12.1987
GB08.07.1988
[1999/42]
Former [1989/33]AT16.12.1987
CH16.12.1987
LI16.12.1987
NL16.12.1987
SE31.12.1987
GB08.07.1988
Former [1989/25]AT16.12.1987
CH16.12.1987
LI16.12.1987
NL16.12.1987
SE31.12.1987
Former [1989/21]AT16.12.1987
NL16.12.1987
SE31.12.1987
Former [1989/13]AT16.12.1987
NL16.12.1987
Former [1989/10]NL16.12.1987
Documents cited:Search[AD]US4146172  ;
 [A]US4244513  ;
 [A]US3480207  ;
 [A]FR499880  ;
 [A]US4061142  ;
 [A]US3190546