Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0070675

EP0070675 - Human calcitonin precursor polyprotein structural gene [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.06.1996
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CELLTECH THERAPEUTICS LIMITED
208 Bath Road Slough
Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB
For all designated states
MacIntyre, Iain
The Royal Postgraduate Medical School Hammersmith Hospital
London W12 0HS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/19]For all designated states
CELLTECH THERAPEUTICS LIMITED
216 Bath Road
Slough, Berkshire SL1 4EN / GB
For all designated states
MacIntyre, Iain
The Royal Postgraduate Medical School Hammersmith Hospital
London W12 0HS / GB
Former [1985/21]For all designated states
CELLTECH LIMITED
244-250 Bath Road
Slough Berkshire SL1 4DY / GB
For all designated states
MacIntyre, Iain
The Royal Postgraduate Medical School Hammersmith Hospital
London W12 0HS / GB
Former [1983/04]For all designated states
Craig, Roger Kingdon
The Courtauld Institute of Biochemistry The Middlesex Hospital School Mortimer Street
London W1P 7PN / GB
For all designated states
MacIntyre, Iain
The Royal Postgraduate Medical School Hammersmith Hospital
London W12 0HS / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Craig, Roger Kingdon The Courtauld Institute
of Biochemistry The Middlesex Hospital School
London W1P 7PN / GB
02 / MacIntyre, Jain
The Royal Postgraduate Medical School
Hammersmith Hospital London W12 0HS / GB
 [2007/32]
Former [1985/25]01 / Craig, Roger Kingdon The Courtauld Institute
of Biochemistry The Middlesex Hospital School
London W1P 7PN / GB
02 / MacIntyre, Jain
The Royal Postgraduate Medical School /
Former [1985/22]01 / Craig, Roger Kingdon The Courtauld Institute
of Biochemistry The Middlesex Hospital School /
Former [1983/04]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Hallybone, Huw George , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/19]Hallybone, Huw George , et al
CARPMAELS AND RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [1983/04]Votier, Sidney David
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date82303667.813.07.1982
[1983/04]
Priority number, dateGB1981002169915.07.1981         Original published format: GB 8121699
GB1981003573826.11.1981         Original published format: GB 8135738
[1983/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0070675
Date:26.01.1983
Language:EN
[1983/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1982
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/00, C12P21/02, C07C103/52
[1983/04]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1983/04]
TitleGerman:Strukturiertes Gen für die Polyprotein-vorstufe des menschlichen Calcitonins[1983/04]
English:Human calcitonin precursor polyprotein structural gene[1983/04]
French:Gene structural pour la polyprotéine-précurseur de la calcitonine humaine[1983/04]
MiscellaneousEPB 1995/05: Teilanmeldung 94203339.0 eingereicht am 13/07/82
EPB 1995/05: Divisional application 94203339.0 filed on 13/07/82
EPB 1995/05: Demande divisionnaire 94203339.0 déposée le 13/07/82
Examination procedure09.03.1983Examination requested  [1983/21]
07.11.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
13.07.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
14.08.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.10.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
18.02.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.11.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.07.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.1994Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
14.11.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.02.1996Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1996/30]
28.02.1996Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1996/30]
Appeal following examination14.09.1994Appeal received No.  T0918/94
15.11.1994Statement of grounds filed
06.07.1995Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
07.12.1989Appeal received No.  T0157/90
06.02.1990Statement of grounds filed
12.09.1991Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
06.07.1995Date of oral proceedings
19.07.1995Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP94203339.0  / EP0645450
Request for further processing for:25.11.1992Request for further processing filed
27.11.1992Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.01.1993Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.1986Renewal fee patent year 05
07.07.1987Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.1988Renewal fee patent year 07
10.07.1989Renewal fee patent year 08
27.07.1990Renewal fee patent year 09
29.07.1991Renewal fee patent year 10
09.07.1992Renewal fee patent year 11
27.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 12
07.07.1994Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.199312   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.1993
31.07.199514   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]  - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., vol. 77, no. 8, August 1980, (US) S.G. AMARA et al.: "Characterization of rat calcitonin mRNA", pages 4444-4448
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 93, no. 17, October 27, 1980, page 218, abstract no. 162892q, Columbus, Ohio (US) C. DESPLAN et al.: "Cell free translation of mRNA coding for human and murine calcitonin" & FEBS Lett. 1980, 117(1), 89-92
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 92, no. 7, February 18, 1979, page 216, abstract no. 53546p, Columbus, Ohio (US) R.H. GOODMAN et al.: "Cell-free translation of messenger RNA coding for a precursor of human calcitonin" & Biochem. Biophys. Res. Commun. 1979, 91(3), 932-8
 [XP]  - BIOCHEM. J., vol. 199, 1981, (GB) J. ALLISON et al.: "The construction and partial characterization of plasmids containing complementary DNA sequences to human calcitonin precursor polyprotein", pages 725-731
 [XP]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 95, no. 15, October 12, 1981, page 199, abstract no. 127640a, Columbus, Ohio (US) J.W. JACOBS et al.: "Calcitonin messenger RNA encodes multiple polypeptides in a single precursor" & Science (Washington, D.C., 1883) 1981, 213(4506), 457-9