Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0070675 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0070675



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 888
26.06.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
01.06.1996 Closing of application Search / examination 2
28.02.1996 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
14.11.1995 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
02.10.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
02.10.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.09.1995 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
19.07.1995 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
19.07.1995 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.07.1995 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.07.1995 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.07.1995 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 13
06.07.1995 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 13
06.07.1995 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
06.07.1995 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
06.07.1995 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
06.07.1995 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
06.06.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
06.06.1995 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
26.05.1995 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
26.05.1995 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
24.05.1995 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
24.05.1995 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
28.03.1995 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
02.03.1995 Request for assignment Search / examination 3
23.12.1994 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
23.12.1994 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
21.12.1994 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
21.12.1994 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
17.11.1994 Claims Appeal 1
17.11.1994 Claims Appeal 1
17.11.1994 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
17.11.1994 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
15.11.1994 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
15.11.1994 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
06.10.1994 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
06.10.1994 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
14.09.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
14.09.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
14.09.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
14.09.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
14.09.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
14.09.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
14.09.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
14.09.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
14.09.1994 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
14.09.1994 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
05.07.1994 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 21
05.07.1994 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 8
22.04.1994 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
22.04.1994 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
19.04.1994 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 5
18.04.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 1
12.04.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 1
31.03.1994 Preparation of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.03.1994 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
07.09.1993 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
29.07.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
18.06.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
15.06.1993 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.06.1993 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.02.1993 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
20.01.1993 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
09.12.1992 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
09.12.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 11
27.11.1992 Annex Search / examination 7
27.11.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
27.11.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
27.11.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
27.11.1992 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
25.11.1992 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 13
21.09.1992 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
11.06.1992 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
04.06.1992 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.06.1992 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.03.1992 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
17.03.1992 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
11.03.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
11.03.1992 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
30.01.1992 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
17.10.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
17.10.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
24.09.1991 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
24.09.1991 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
12.09.1991 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 16
12.09.1991 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 16
12.09.1991 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 16
12.09.1991 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 16
12.09.1991 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
12.09.1991 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
12.09.1991 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
12.09.1991 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
27.05.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
24.05.1991 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.05.1991 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
15.05.1991 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
15.05.1991 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
15.05.1991 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
13.05.1991 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
13.05.1991 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
13.03.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
13.03.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.05.1990 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
04.05.1990 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
02.05.1990 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
02.05.1990 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
19.02.1990 Processing of an appeal Search / examination 1
06.02.1990 Claims Appeal 2
06.02.1990 Claims Appeal 3
06.02.1990 Claims Appeal 3
06.02.1990 Claims Appeal 2
06.02.1990 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 11
06.02.1990 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 11
18.12.1989 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
07.12.1989 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
07.12.1989 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
07.12.1989 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
07.12.1989 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
07.12.1989 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
07.12.1989 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
07.12.1989 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
07.12.1989 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
10.10.1989 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
05.10.1989 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 9
05.10.1989 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 16
09.08.1989 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 2
09.08.1989 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
04.08.1989 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 5
25.07.1989 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 2
20.07.1989 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
01.02.1989 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.01.1989 Annex Search / examination 1
07.01.1989 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
05.01.1989 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.11.1988 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.11.1988 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.11.1988 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.11.1988 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.07.1988 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 3
20.05.1988 Claims Search / examination 3
20.05.1988 Description Search / examination 2
20.05.1988 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
05.10.1987 Annex Search / examination 1
05.10.1987 Claims Search / examination 3
05.10.1987 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
02.10.1987 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.08.1987 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.07.1987 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.03.1987 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
04.09.1986 Annex Search / examination 2
04.09.1986 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
04.09.1986 Priority document Search / examination 17
14.08.1986 Claims Search / examination 5
14.08.1986 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
01.08.1986 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
25.07.1986 Annex Search / examination 1
25.07.1986 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
22.07.1986 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.06.1986 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.05.1986 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.01.1986 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
13.07.1985 Claims Search / examination 4
13.07.1985 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
15.05.1985 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
09.05.1985 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.05.1985 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.03.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
01.03.1985 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.02.1985 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.02.1985 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 5
02.02.1985 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
02.02.1985 Request for assignment Search / examination 1
07.11.1984 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
10.03.1983 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
02.02.1983 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
07.01.1983 Annex Search / examination 1
30.11.1982 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
18.11.1982 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.11.1982 European search report Search / examination 2
30.08.1982 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
30.08.1982 Priority document Search / examination 22
30.08.1982 Priority document Search / examination 15
23.08.1982 Drawings Search / examination 13
23.08.1982 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
29.07.1982 Invitation to remedy deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 2
13.07.1982 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.07.1982 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
13.07.1982 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
13.07.1982 Claims Search / examination 3
13.07.1982 Description Search / examination 31
13.07.1982 Drawings Search / examination 13
13.07.1982 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 11
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 15
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 15
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
13.07.1982 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 14
13.07.1982 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10