blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0072162

EP0072162 - Method and system for controlling ignition timing in a multicylinder internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  05.03.1993
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD.
1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1983/07]For all designated states
NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD.
1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Inoue, Shingo
Mezon Kamiya 101, 3-33 Sumiyoshi-cho 2-chome
Anjo-shi Aichi-ken / JP
02 / Iwata, Toshiharu
1-32 Aza Mihoden Oaza Hishiike
Kouda-cho Nukata-gun Aichi-ken / JP
03 / Takasu, Yasuhito
45-18 Aza Morita Machihata-cho
Toyohashi-shi Aichi-ken / JP
[1983/07]
Representative(s)Milhench, Howard Leslie, et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1990/23]Milhench, Howard Leslie, et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Former [1988/05]Wright, Peter David John
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Former [1983/10]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 12-15, Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1PL / GB
Former [1983/07]Beresford, Keith Denis Louis
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 12-15, Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1PL / GB
Application number, filing date82304034.030.07.1982
[1983/07]
Priority number, dateJP1981012002601.08.1981         Original published format: JP 12002681
JP1981014200409.09.1981         Original published format: JP 14200481
JP1981014443511.09.1981         Original published format: JP 14443581
[1983/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0072162
Date:16.02.1983
Language:EN
[1983/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0072162
Date:17.08.1983
Language:EN
[1983/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0072162
Date:29.01.1986
Language:EN
[1986/05]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0072162
Date:21.04.1993
Language:EN
[1993/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.06.1983
ClassificationIPC:F02P5/04
[1983/07]
CPC:
F02P5/1455 (EP,US); Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1983/07]
TitleGerman:Methode und System für die Steuerung des Zündzeitpunktes einer polyzylindrischen Brennkraft Maschine[1983/07]
English:Method and system for controlling ignition timing in a multicylinder internal combustion engine[1983/07]
French:Méthode et système de commande d'avance à l'allumage pour un moteur à combustion interne à plusieurs cylindres[1983/07]
Examination procedure15.08.1983Examination requested  [1983/42]
26.04.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
19.07.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.1985Fee for grant paid
12.09.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.10.1986  21.01.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Robert Bosch GmbH
Zentralabteilung Patente
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
 02  29.10.1986  21.01.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1986/52]
Opponent(s)01  27.10.1986  21.01.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Robert Bosch GmbH
Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20
D-70442 Stuttgart / DE
 02  29.10.1986  21.01.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
D-80506 München / DE
Former [1986/51]
Opponent(s)01  27.10.1986  21.01.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Robert Bosch GmbH
Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20
D-70442 Stuttgart / DE
27.01.1987Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.10.1987Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.12.1987Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
12.04.1988Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
10.10.1989Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
15.12.1989Reply to a communication from the opposition division
01.03.1991Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
09.11.1992Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
11.11.1992Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
11.02.1993Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition19.04.1991Appeal received No.  T0318/91
19.04.1991Statement of grounds filed
18.08.1992Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
18.08.1992Date of oral proceedings
20.08.1992Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4054111  (SAND ROGER D);
 [A]US4268910  (OMORI NORIO, et al);
 [A]US4240388  (FUJISAWA HIDEYA [JP], et al);
 [A]US4233944  (OMORI NORIO, et al);
 [A]US4234850  (COLLINS THOMAS W);
 [A]US4257373  (MCDOUGAL JOHN A [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.