blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0072193

EP0072193 - Endoscopes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.08.1986
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.10.2007  [2007/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Olympus Optical Co., Ltd.
43-2, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1983/07]For all designated states
OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO., LTD.
43-2, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hashiguchi, Toshihiko
No. 3-15 Seishin 8-chome
Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP
[1983/07]
Representative(s)Kennedy, Victor Kenneth, et al
G.F. REDFERN & CO., Redfern House, 149/151 Tarring Road Worthing
West Sussex BN11 4HE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1983/07]Kennedy, Victor Kenneth, et al
G.F. REDFERN & CO., Redfern House, 149/151 Tarring Road
Worthing, West Sussex BN11 4HE / GB
Application number, filing date82304105.804.08.1982
[1983/07]
Priority number, dateJP19810117200U05.08.1981         Original published format: JP 11720081 U
[1983/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0072193
Date:16.02.1983
Language:EN
[1983/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0072193
Date:16.10.1985
Language:EN
[1985/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.1982
ClassificationIPC:A61B1/06, G02B6/24
[1985/42]
CPC:
A61B1/07 (EP); A61B1/00126 (EP); A61B1/00128 (EP)
Former IPC [1983/07]A61B1/06, G02B7/26
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1983/07]
TitleGerman:Endoskope[1983/07]
English:Endoscopes[1983/07]
French:Endoscopes[1983/07]
Examination procedure24.01.1983Examination requested  [1983/14]
28.02.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
10.01.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.1985Fee for grant paid
18.01.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.07.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1986/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.07.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.10.1985
BE16.10.1985
CH16.10.1985
FR16.10.1985
IT16.10.1985
LI16.10.1985
NL16.10.1985
SE30.10.1985
[2002/24]
Former [1999/42]AT16.10.1985
BE16.10.1985
CH16.10.1985
IT16.10.1985
LI16.10.1985
NL16.10.1985
SE30.10.1985
Former [1988/17]AT16.10.1985
BE16.10.1985
CH16.10.1985
LI16.10.1985
NL16.10.1985
SE30.10.1985
Former [1988/13]AT16.10.1985
BE16.10.1985
CH16.10.1985
LI16.10.1985
SE30.10.1985
Former [1988/04]AT16.10.1985
BE16.10.1985
CH16.10.1985
LI16.10.1985
Former [1987/26]AT16.10.1985
CH16.10.1985
LI16.10.1985
Former [1987/19]AT16.10.1985
Documents cited:Search[A]GB1365723  (CAVIS CAVETTI ISOLATI SPA);
 [A]US3897134  (SCRIVO LEONARD, et al);
 [A]GB1463350  (BOWTHORPE HELLERMANN LTD)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.