blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0074243

EP0074243 - Hair dye composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.1987
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2008Change - applicantpublished on 06.08.2008  [2008/32]
Applicant(s)For:GB 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House
Blackfriars
London
Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:AT  BE  CH  DE  FR  IT  LI  NL  SE 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/32]For:GB 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars London
EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:AT  BE  CH  DE  FR  IT  LI  NL  SE 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Former [1983/11]For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:AT  BE  CH  DE  FR  IT  LI  NL  SE 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Pike, Barry Graham
April Cottage Pipers Lane
Lower Heswall Wirral Merseyside / GB
[1983/11]
Representative(s)Tonge, Robert James, et al
UNILEVER PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
[1983/28]
Former [1983/11]Tonge, Robert James
UNILEVER PLC Patents Division P.O. Box 68 Unilever House
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
Application number, filing date82304596.801.09.1982
[1983/11]
Priority number, dateGB1981002670003.09.1981         Original published format: GB 8126700
[1983/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0074243
Date:16.03.1983
Language:EN
[1983/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0074243
Date:26.11.1986
Language:EN
[1986/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.11.1982
ClassificationIPC:A61K7/13
[1983/11]
CPC:
A61K8/411 (EP,US); A61K8/415 (EP,US); A61Q5/10 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1983/11]
TitleGerman:Haarfärbemittel[1983/11]
English:Hair dye composition[1983/11]
French:Composition de teinture pour cheveux[1983/11]
Examination procedure18.08.1983Examination requested  [1984/15]
10.05.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.02.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.09.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
28.04.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.06.1986Fee for grant paid
04.06.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.08.1987No opposition filed within time limit [1987/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.1986Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]FR1337012  (HANS SCHWARZKOPF);
 [X]FR1372525  (INTERPAL S A);
 [X]CH445722  (WELLA AG [DE]);
 [A]DE1492256  (INTERPAL S A);
 [Y]FR2258167  (UNILEVER NV [NL])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.