blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0074758

EP0074758 - 4a-Substituted avermectin compounds, their production and antiparasitic use, and compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.05.1987
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.1987No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.07.1987 [1987/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck & Co., Inc.
126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway
New Jersey 07065-0900 / US
[N/P]
Former [1983/12]For all designated states
MERCK & CO. INC.
126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000
Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mrozik, Helmut H.
159 Idlebrook Lane
Matawan New Jersey 07747 / US
[1983/12]
Representative(s)Crampton, Keith John Allen, et al
D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
[1983/12]
Application number, filing date82304620.602.09.1982
[1983/12]
Priority number, dateUS1981029886103.09.1981         Original published format: US 298861
[1983/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0074758
Date:23.03.1983
Language:EN
[1983/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0074758
Date:16.07.1986
Language:EN
[1986/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.01.1983
ClassificationIPC:C07H17/08, C07D493/22, A61K31/70, A61K31/34, // A01N63/02 ,(C07D493/22, 313:00, 311:00, 311:00, 307:00)
[1983/12]
CPC:
A61P33/00 (EP); C07H19/01 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1983/12]
TitleGerman:4a-Substituierte Avermecitinderivate, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung als antiparasitäres Mittel und sie enthaltende Zusammensetzungen[1983/12]
English:4a-Substituted avermectin compounds, their production and antiparasitic use, and compositions containing them[1983/12]
French:Dérivés de l'avermécitine substitués en position 4a, leur fabrication et leur emploi antiparasitaire et les compositions les contenant[1983/12]
File destroyed:03.03.2001
Examination procedure10.08.1983Examination requested  [1983/41]
12.09.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
13.07.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
03.01.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.1986Fee for grant paid
10.01.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.04.1987No opposition filed within time limit [1987/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
17.09.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]FR2387231  (MERCK & CO INC [US]);
 [Y]EP0001689  (MERCK & CO INC [US]);
 [Y]FR2348970  (MERCK & CO INC [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.