Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0077193

EP0077193 - Optical arrangements for Head-up Displays and Night Vision Goggles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1983/16]Optical arrangements
[1985/38]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.07.1986
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.1986No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.09.1986 [1986/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEC AVIONICS LIMITED
Airport Works Rochester
Kent ME1 2XX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1985/16]For all designated states
GEC AVIONICS LIMITED
Airport Works
Rochester Kent ME1 2XX / GB
Former [1984/31]For all designated states
MARCONI AVIONICS LIMITED
Airport Works
Rochester Kent ME1 2XX / GB
Former [1983/16]For all designated states
MARCONI AVIONICS LIMITED
Airport Works
Rochester Kent / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Ellis, Stafford Malcolm
Midways Willowhayne Estate Angmering Lane
East Preston West Sussex / GB
[1983/16]
Representative(s)Pope, Michael Bertram Wingate
The General Electric Company, p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane
Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB
[1984/42]
Former [1983/16]Pope, Michael Bertram Wingate
Central Patent Department The General Electric Company, p.l.c. Hirst Research Centre East Lane
Wembley Middlesex HA9 7PP / GB
Application number, filing date82305370.708.10.1982
[1983/16]
Priority number, dateGB1981003101114.10.1981         Original published format: GB 8131011
GB1982001149921.04.1982         Original published format: GB 8211499
[1983/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0077193
Date:20.04.1983
Language:EN
[1983/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0077193
Date:12.10.1983
Language:EN
[1983/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0077193
Date:18.09.1985
Language:EN
[1985/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.08.1983
ClassificationInternational:G02B27/00, G02B17/00
[1983/16]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   IT,   NL,   SE [1983/16]
TitleGerman:Optische Anordnung für auf dem Kopf befestigtes Sichtgerät und Nachtsichtgerät[1985/38]
English:Optical arrangements for Head-up Displays and Night Vision Goggles[1985/38]
French:Arrangement optique pour un système d'affichage porté sur la tête et des lunettes de vision nocturne[1985/38]
Former [1983/16]Optische Anordnung
Former [1983/16]Optical arrangements
Former [1983/16]Arrangement optique
Examination procedure22.09.1983Examination requested  [1983/48]
29.06.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
05.03.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.1985Fee for grant paid
15.03.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.06.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1986/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.09.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2184923  ;
 [A]CH566562  ;
 [A]FR2406216  ;
 [A]US4000419  ;
 [A]GB1264343
 [A]  - MACHINE DESIGN, vol. 52, no. 18, August 1980, pages 36-39, Cleveland, Ohio, USA