blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0062550

EP0062550 - Process for the thermochemical treatments of metals by ion bombardment [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  19.03.1993
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INNOVATIQUE S.A.
Place Charles Andrieu
F-60530 Neuilly en Thelle / FR
[1988/35]
Former [1982/41]For all designated states
VIDE ET TRAITEMENT Société Anonyme dite:
Place Charles Andrieu
F-60530 Neuilly-en-Thelle / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Speri, Roger
14 bis rue Colas Fedron
F-78700 Conflans Sainte Honorine / FR
[1982/41]
Representative(s)de Saint-Palais, Arnaud Marie
Cabinet Moutard
35 Rue de la Paroisse
B.P. 20513
78005 Versailles Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1988/35]de Saint-Palais, Arnaud Marie
CABINET MOUTARD 35, Avenue Victor Hugo
F-78960 Voisins le Bretonneux / FR
Former [1984/06]Marquer, Francis
35, Avenue Victor Hugo Résidence Chamfleury
F-78180 Voisins-le-Bretonneux / FR
Former [1982/41]Jolly, Jean-Pierre
Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy
F-75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date82400407.109.03.1982
[1982/41]
Priority number, dateFR1981000510713.03.1981         Original published format: FR 8105107
[1982/41]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0062550
Date:13.10.1982
Language:FR
[1982/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0062550
Date:12.10.1988
Language:FR
[1988/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.1982
ClassificationIPC:C23C14/00, C23C14/30
[1988/41]
CPC:
C23C8/36 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1982/41]C23C15/00, C23C11/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1982/41]
TitleGerman:Verfahren für die thermochemischen Behandlungen von Metallen durch Ionenbeschuss[1982/41]
English:Process for the thermochemical treatments of metals by ion bombardment[1982/41]
French:Procédé de traitements thermochimiques de métaux par bombardement ionique[1982/41]
Examination procedure17.02.1983Examination requested  [1983/17]
21.03.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.07.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.10.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.04.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.06.1988Fee for grant paid
01.06.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.07.1989  13.09.1989  ADMISSIBLE
Plasma Technik Grün GmbH
Industriestrasse 12
D-5900 Siegen (Weidenau) / DE
Opponent's representative
Vonnemann, Gerhard
VKK Patentanwälte PartG mbB
An der Alster 84
20099 Hamburg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1990/20]
Opponent(s)01  12.07.1989  13.09.1989  ADMISSIBLE
Plasma Technik Grün GmbH
Industriestrasse 12
D-5900 Siegen (Weidenau) / DE
Opponent's representative
Vonnemann, Gerhard, Dr.-Ing.
Strasse, Vonnemann & Partner An der Alster 84
D-20099 Hamburg / DE
Former [1989/37]
Opponent(s)01  12.07.1989   
Plasma Technik Grün GmbH
Industriestrasse 12
D-5900 Siegen (Weidenau) / DE
Opponent's representative
Meyer, Ludgerus A., Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Jungfernstieg 38
D-20354 Hamburg / DE
15.09.1989Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.01.1990Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.01.1990Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
21.03.1990Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
30.10.1992Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
11.11.1992Legal effect of revocation of patent [1993/19]
Appeal following opposition12.07.1990Appeal received No.  T0562/90
10.09.1990Statement of grounds filed
30.10.1992Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
30.10.1992Date of oral proceedings
09.11.1992Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
23.01.1986Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.1987Renewal fee patent year 06
03.02.1988Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2015/21]
Former [1993/38]CH12.10.1988
LI12.10.1988
Documents cited:Search[A]FR1053916  (BERGHAUS ELEKTROPHYSIK ANST);
 [A]US3108900  (PAPP CORNELIUS A);
 [A]FR2003632  (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD);
 [A]FR2332336  (VIDE & TRAITEMENT SA [FR]);
 [A]FR2332337  (VIDE & TRAITEMENT SA [FR]);
 [A]FR2379615  (VIDE & TRAITEMENT SA [FR])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.