blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0074301

EP0074301 - Linear position sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.04.1986
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE BENDIX CORPORATION
Executive Offices Bendix Center Southfield
Michigan 48037 / US
[N/P]
Former [1983/11]For all designated states
THE BENDIX CORPORATION
Executive Offices Bendix Center
Southfield Michigan 48037 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Arnett, Samuel Emerson
61353 Miami Road
South Bend Indiana 46614 / US
[1983/11]
Representative(s)Huchet, André, et al
Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad
93700 Drancy / FR
[N/P]
Former [1983/11]Huchet, André, et al
Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad
F-93700 Drancy / FR
Application number, filing date82401561.420.08.1982
[1983/11]
Priority number, dateUS1981029739928.08.1981         Original published format: US 297399
[1983/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0074301
Date:16.03.1983
Language:EN
[1983/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0074301
Date:22.05.1985
Language:EN
[1985/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.03.1985
ClassificationIPC:G01D5/20
[1983/11]
CPC:
G01D5/2046 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1983/11]
TitleGerman:Linearpositionsgeber[1983/11]
English:Linear position sensor[1983/11]
French:Capteur de position linéaire[1983/11]
File destroyed:04.12.1992
Examination procedure26.08.1982Examination requested  [1983/11]
23.11.1985Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1986/23]
20.12.1985Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1986/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
17.07.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2466620  ;
 [X]US4083237  ;
 [X]FR2311276  ;
 [X]DE2617624
 [A]  - H. SCHMID: Electronic Analog Digital Conversions, 1970, Nostrand New York, (US), pages 282-283"The Dual-Slope Integration A/D Converter".
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.