blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0077238

EP0077238 - Method and apparatus for authenticating the signature of a message [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  07.02.1994
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BULL S.A.
Tour BULL, 1, place Carpeaux
92800 Puteaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [1991/48]For all designated states
BULL S.A.
Tour BULL, 1, place Carpeaux
F-92800 Puteaux / FR
Former [1983/16]For all designated states
COMPAGNIE INTERNATIONALE POUR L'INFORMATIQUE CII - HONEYWELL BULL (dite CII-HB)
94, avenue Gambetta
F-75020 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Mollier, Jean
94 avenue Gambetta
F-75020 Paris / FR
02 / Saada, Charles
94 avenue Gambetta
F-75020 Paris / FR
[1983/16]
Representative(s)Debay, Yves, et al
BULL S.A.
Tour BULL Cédex 74
PC/TB2803
92039 Paris La Défense / FR
[N/P]
Former [1991/48]Debay, Yves, et al
BULL S.A. Tour BULL Cédex 74 PC/TB2803
F-92039 Paris La Défense / FR
Former [1987/13]Doireau, Marc
Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle BULL SA, Poste Courrier: LV59C18, 68 route de Versaillles
F-78430 Louveciennes / FR
Former [1983/16]Doireau, Marc
BULL S.A. Industrial Property Department 25 avenue de la Grande-Armée
F-75016 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date82401752.928.09.1982
[1983/16]
Priority number, dateFR1981001909009.10.1981         Original published format: FR 8119090
[1983/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0077238
Date:20.04.1983
Language:FR
[1983/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0077238
Date:05.02.1986
Language:FR
[1986/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.1983
ClassificationIPC:H04L9/00
[1983/16]
CPC:
G06Q20/40975 (EP,US); G06Q20/341 (EP,US); G06Q20/3674 (EP,US);
G07F7/1008 (EP,US); H04L9/3247 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1983/16]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Feststellen der Authentizität der Unterschrift einer unterschriebenen Nachricht[1986/06]
English:Method and apparatus for authenticating the signature of a message[1983/16]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour authentifier la signature d'un message signé[1983/16]
Former [1983/16]Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Authentifizieren der Unterschrift einer unterschriebenen Nachricht
Examination procedure30.08.1983Examination requested  [1984/08]
29.06.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.10.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
21.06.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.1985Fee for grant paid
15.07.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.11.1986  25.11.1986  ADMISSIBLE
GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH
Euckenstrasse 12
D-81369 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1986/52]
Opponent(s)01  04.11.1986  25.11.1986  ADMISSIBLE
GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH
Euckenstrasse 12
D-81369 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
D-80797 München / DE
10.12.1986Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.05.1987Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.07.1987Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
13.01.1988Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
16.06.1989Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M05)
27.11.1989Reply to a communication from the opposition division
15.03.1991Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
16.07.1991Reply to a communication from the opposition division
03.02.1992Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.06.1993Legal effect of revocation of patent [1994/13]
13.01.1994Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition31.03.1992Appeal received No.  T0304/92
03.06.1992Statement of grounds filed
23.06.1993Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
22.06.1993Date of oral proceedings
28.06.1993Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2015/21]
Former [1995/03]CH05.02.1986
LI05.02.1986
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0021401  (IBM [US]);
 [A]EP0035448  (CII HONEYWELL BULL [FR])
 [Y]  - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE, vol. 35, 1er octobre 1981, pages 296-301, Oak Brook, Ill. USA
Examination   - AFIPS Conference proceedings, vol. 40, 1979, National Computer Conference, June 4-7, 1979, New York, pages 831-837
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.