blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0077709

EP0077709 - Spacer grid for a nuclear reactor fuel assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.12.1986
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.1986No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.01.1987 [1987/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique
31-33, rue de la Fédération, Boîte Postale 150
75752 Paris Cedex 15 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1983/17]For all designated states
COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE Etablissement de Caractère Scientifique Technique et Industriel
31/33, rue de la Fédération
F-75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Feutrel, Claude
105 Grande Rue
F-91430 Vauhallan / FR
[1983/17]
Representative(s)Mongrédien, André, et al
c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu
F-75008 Paris / FR
[1983/17]
Application number, filing date82401828.706.10.1982
[1983/17]
Priority number, dateFR1981001948316.10.1981         Original published format: FR 8119483
[1983/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0077709
Date:27.04.1983
Language:FR
[1983/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0077709
Date:29.01.1986
Language:FR
[1986/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.02.1983
ClassificationIPC:G21C3/34
[1983/17]
CPC:
G21C3/352 (EP,US); G21C3/34 (KR); Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   GB,   IT,   NL [1983/17]
TitleGerman:Abstandshalter für Kernreaktor-Brennelement-Bündel[1983/17]
English:Spacer grid for a nuclear reactor fuel assembly[1983/17]
French:Grille d'espacement pour élément combustible de réacteur nucléaire[1983/17]
Examination procedure28.09.1983Examination requested  [1983/49]
06.09.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
26.04.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.1985Fee for grant paid
20.06.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.10.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1987/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE1514559  (SIEMENS AG);
 [Y]LU78144  ;
 [Y]FR2083628  (COMBUSTION ENG);
 [A]US3715275  (KRAWIEC D);
 [A]US4058436  (ANTHONY ANDREW J);
 [A]US3442763  (CHETTER JOHN, et al);
 [AP]GB2081961  (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP);
 [A]DE1439362  (SIEMENS AG);
 [A]DE2602124  (KRAFTWERK UNION AG);
 [AD]FR2457544  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.