Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0078208 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0078208



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 284
22.10.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
21.02.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.01.1995 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
20.01.1995 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
20.01.1995 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
17.01.1995 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
16.01.1995 Deletion of the entry relating to the representative ('et al' case) Search / examination 1
17.10.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
05.10.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
04.10.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.10.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.09.1994 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
27.09.1994 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
27.09.1994 Decision to allow further processing Opposition 1
16.09.1994 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.09.1994 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
07.09.1994 Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent/failure to reply to a notice of opposition Opposition 1
07.09.1994 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
10.08.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
10.08.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
19.07.1994 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 7
19.07.1994 Refund of fees Appeal 1
01.06.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.05.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
18.04.1994 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 1
18.04.1994 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 2
18.04.1994 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 1
05.01.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.01.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
03.01.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
17.12.1993 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 12
09.07.1993 Decision rejecting the opposition Appeal 1
09.07.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.07.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.07.1993 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
06.07.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
29.04.1993 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
29.04.1993 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.04.1993 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 2
02.03.1992 Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
03.01.1992 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
05.12.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.12.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.11.1991 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 6
22.11.1991 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 7
06.08.1990 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
04.07.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.06.1989 Abstract Appeal 1
26.06.1989 Claims Appeal 2
26.06.1989 Claims Appeal 2
26.06.1989 Claims Appeal 2
26.06.1989 Description Appeal 10
26.06.1989 Drawings Appeal 2
26.06.1989 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
08.06.1989 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
31.05.1989 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
17.04.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.04.1989 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
17.04.1989 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
08.03.1989 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
28.02.1989 Request for assignment Search / examination 7
26.01.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.01.1989 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
24.01.1989 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.01.1989 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.01.1989 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
17.01.1989 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
02.01.1989 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
21.12.1988 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
21.11.1988 Notice of appeal Appeal 4
19.10.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.10.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.10.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.10.1988 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
12.10.1988 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
12.10.1988 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 7
06.10.1988 Claims Opposition 2
06.10.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.07.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.07.1988 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
18.06.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.06.1988 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.1988 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
14.03.1988 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
09.03.1988 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
27.11.1987 Request for assignment Search / examination 1
11.02.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.01.1986 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 3
13.11.1985 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
21.10.1985 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
21.10.1985 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
21.10.1985 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
10.10.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
27.09.1985 Document concerning representation Opposition 2
03.07.1985 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
03.07.1985 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
01.06.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
23.05.1985 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
03.01.1985 Annex Search / examination 1
06.07.1984 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
28.02.1984 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.02.1984 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
28.02.1984 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
13.02.1984 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
21.01.1984 Claims Search / examination 2
21.01.1984 Description Search / examination 4
21.01.1984 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
12.01.1984 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.01.1984 Text intended for grant Search / examination 11
22.11.1983 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
11.11.1983 Claims Search / examination 2
11.11.1983 Description Search / examination 4
11.11.1983 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
11.08.1983 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
17.05.1983 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
03.05.1983 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
03.05.1983 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
08.04.1983 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
21.02.1983 European search report Search / examination 1
25.11.1982 EPO/applicant correspondence crossed Search / examination 1
23.11.1982 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
22.11.1982 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 6
22.11.1982 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
22.11.1982 Priority document Search / examination 8
17.11.1982 Invitation to file authorisation Search / examination 1
27.10.1982 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.10.1982 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.10.1982 Claims Search / examination 2
22.10.1982 Description Search / examination 6
22.10.1982 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.10.1982 Drawings Search / examination 3
22.10.1982 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
22.10.1982 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10