blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0061414

EP0061414 - High clarity colorless polyesters [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  20.08.1993
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 09.07.2008  [2008/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
1144 East Market Street
Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US
[N/P]
Former [1982/39]For all designated states
THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
1144 East Market Street
Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Callander, Douglas David
590 San Moritz Drive
Akron Ohio 44313 / US
02 / Massey, Fred Lee
2646 Foxfire Street, Northwest
Uniontown Ohio 44685 / US
[1982/39]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/16]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
D-81671 München / DE
Former [1982/39]Weyland, J.J. Pierre
Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg
L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU
Application number, filing date82630017.026.02.1982
[1982/39]
Priority number, dateUS1981024583820.03.1981         Original published format: US 245838
[1982/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0061414
Date:29.09.1982
Language:EN
[1982/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0061414
Date:29.01.1986
Language:EN
[1986/05]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0061414
Date:06.10.1993
Language:EN
[1993/40]
Type: B2 RE Reissue of amended patent specification
No.:EP0061414
Date:06.07.1994
[1994/34]
Type: B2 RE Reissue of amended patent specification
No.:EP0061414
Date:08.08.1994
[1994/39]
Type: B2 RE Reissue of amended patent specification
No.:EP0061414
Date:28.09.1994
[1994/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.1982
ClassificationIPC:C08L67/02
[1982/39]
CPC:
C08G63/82 (EP); C08L83/04 (KR); C08K13/02 (EP);
C08L67/02 (KR); C08L83/06 (KR)
C-Set:
C08K13/02, C08L67/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1982/39]
TitleGerman:Farblose Polyester mit hoher Klarheit[1982/39]
English:High clarity colorless polyesters[1982/39]
French:Polyesters incolores de haute clarté[1982/39]
Examination procedure03.03.1982Examination requested  [1982/39]
06.09.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.03.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
19.07.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.1985Fee for grant paid
23.08.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.10.1986  25.11.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Velperweg 76
NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Intellectual Property Department
P.O. Box 9300
6800 SB Arnhem / NL
 02  25.10.1986  12.12.1986  ADMISSIBLE
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/28]
Opponent(s)01  16.10.1986  25.11.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Velperweg 76
NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis
AKZO NOBEL N.V. Intellectual Property Department PO Box 9300
6800 SB Arnhem / NL
 02  25.10.1986  12.12.1986  ADMISSIBLE
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [1986/51]
Opponent(s)01  16.10.1986  25.11.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo N.V.
Velperweg 76
NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis
Akzo Nobel N.V. Patent Department P.O. 9300
NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL
 02  25.10.1986  12.12.1986  ADMISSIBLE
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
15.12.1986Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.06.1987Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.08.1987Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
16.12.1987Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
07.04.1988Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
14.06.1988Reply to a communication from the opposition division
15.11.1989Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
27.11.1992Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
11.05.1993Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
16.07.1993Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition21.12.1989Appeal received No.  T0005/90
24.03.1990Statement of grounds filed
27.11.1992Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
27.11.1992Date of oral proceedings
03.12.1992Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
24.01.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JP7787495  ;
 JP7787495  [ ]
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 88, no. 2, 9th January 1978, page 35, no. 7879u, Columbus, Ohio, USA & JP - A - 77 87495 (JAPAN ESTER CO., LTD.) 21-07-1977, & JP7787495 A 00000000
    [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 88, no. 2, 9th January 1978, page 35, no. 7879u, Columbus, Ohio, USA & JP - A - 77 87495 (JAPAN ESTER CO., LTD.) 21-07-1977, & JP7787495 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.