blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0077757

EP0077757 - Process for detecting failures in a dielectric coating on the surface of an electrically conducting substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.03.1986
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.1986No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.04.1986 [1986/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE
7 route de Drize
CH-1227 Carouge/Genève / CH
[1983/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Vermot-Gaud, Jacques
23a, route de Certoux
CH-1258 Perly / CH
02 / Kornmann, Michel
31, chemin des Palettes
CH-1212 Grand-Lancy / CH
[1983/17]
Representative(s)Dousse, Blasco, et al
73, Avenue de Mategin
1217 Meyrin-Genève / CH
[N/P]
Former [1983/17]Dousse, Blasco, et al
7, route de Drize
CH-1227 Carouge/Genève / CH
Application number, filing date82810423.211.10.1982
[1983/17]
Priority number, dateCH1981000661916.10.1981         Original published format: CH 661981
[1983/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0077757
Date:27.04.1983
Language:FR
[1983/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0077757
Date:24.04.1985
Language:FR
[1985/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.1983
ClassificationIPC:G01R29/08
[1983/17]
CPC:
G01R31/1263 (EP,US); G01N17/00 (EP,US); G01N27/205 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT [1983/17]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Fehlererkennung einer dielektrischen Schicht an der Oberfläche eines elektrisch leitenden Substrats[1983/17]
English:Process for detecting failures in a dielectric coating on the surface of an electrically conducting substrate[1983/17]
French:Procédé pour détecter les défauts d'un revêtement diélectrique à la surface d'un substrat électriquement conducteur[1983/17]
Examination procedure09.09.1983Examination requested  [1983/46]
18.07.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
05.10.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.12.1984Fee for grant paid
14.12.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.01.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1986/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.10.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2015165  (KOA OIL CO LTD);
 [A]AU436753B  ;
 [A]US3210655  (MCGLASSON ROBERT L, et al);
 [A]FR1338781  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO);
 [A]FR2354563  (INTERSUB DEV SA [FR])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.