blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0070260

EP0070260 - An axial-flow thresher-separator unit for combine harvesters [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.06.1986
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip24.06.1986No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.08.1986 [1986/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PIETRO LAVERDA S.p.A.
Via Francesco Laverda 15/17
36042 Breganze (Vicenza) / IT
[N/P]
Former [1983/03]For all designated states
PIETRO LAVERDA S.p.A.
Via Francesco Laverda 15/17
I-36042 Breganze (Vicenza) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Raineri, Giuseppe
Via Bellini 20/22
I-36061 Bassano del Grappa (Vicenza) / IT
[1983/03]
Representative(s)Notaro, Giancarlo, et al
Jacobacci-Casetta & Perani S.p.A.
Via Alfieri 17
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [1983/03]Notaro, Giancarlo, et al
c/o Jacobacci-Casetta & Perani S.p.A. Via Alfieri, 17
I-10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date82830178.816.06.1982
[1983/03]
Priority number, dateIT1981006796813.07.1981         Original published format: IT 6796881
[1983/03]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0070260
Date:19.01.1983
Language:EN
[1983/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0070260
Date:18.05.1983
Language:EN
[1983/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0070260
Date:21.08.1985
Language:EN
[1985/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.1983
ClassificationIPC:A01F12/18, A01F7/06
[1983/03]
CPC:
A01F7/065 (EP); A01F12/18 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB [1983/03]
TitleGerman:Axialfluss-Dresch- und Trennvorrichtungseinheit für Mähdrescher[1983/03]
English:An axial-flow thresher-separator unit for combine harvesters[1983/03]
French:Unité batteur-séparateur à écoulement axial pour moissonneuse-batteuse[1983/03]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure20.04.1983Examination requested  [1983/28]
13.04.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
08.01.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.1985Fee for grant paid
07.02.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.05.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1986/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2302679  (CLAAS MASCHF GMBH GEB [DE]);
 [A]DE2812655  (ALLIS CHALMERS);
 [A]US4154250  (STUBER MICHAEL R [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.